Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-01146

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Anita L Shodeen
Case #: 4:18-ap-30037
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2018
Terminated:Mar 30, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
David W. Sinnwell
7080 Forest Dr.
Johnston, IA 50131
Represented By
David W. Sinnwell
contact info
Plaintiff
John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust
Represented By
Gary R Fischer
Simpson Jensen Abels Fischer & Bouslog
contact info
Michael S Eganhouse
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
court Close Case - Adversary Tue 03/30 10:54 AM
Adversary Case Closed 18-30037 (jmk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
30 30 motion Stipulated Dismissal Thu 03/25 9:42 AM
Stipulated Dismissal Filed by Gregory M Schrieber on behalf of John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust. (Schrieber, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
29 29 order Stay Order - Order Fri 03/08 10:03 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Related [+],. (mrw)
Related: [-] 22 28
Thursday, March 07, 2019
28 28 motion Stipulation Thu 03/07 10:08 AM
Stipulation By and Between John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust and Defendant David W. Sinnwell Filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust Related [+]. (Schrieber, Gregory)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust
Monday, February 25, 2019
27 27 court Judge Shodeen Hearing Mon 02/25 12:21 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 3/7/2019 at 02:30 PM at Telephonic Hrg with Judge Shodeen.(jmk)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust,26 Objection filed by Defendant David W. Sinnwell
Friday, February 22, 2019
26 26 objectio Objection Fri 02/22 10:59 AM
Objection Filed by David W. Sinnwell Related [+](Lantz, Todd
Related: [-] related documents(s)22 Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust
Thursday, February 07, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/07 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/07/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
24 24 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Tue 02/05 5:10 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 2/26/2019. (jmk)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust
23 23 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/05 5:09 PM
Minute Order Regarding Status Conference Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,12 Answer to Complaint,21 Hearing Set
22 22 motion Stay -Do not use for MFRFS Tue 02/05 2:27 PM
Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Gregory M Schrieber on behalf of John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust (Schrieber, Gregory)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust1
Monday, January 14, 2019
21 21 court Judge Shodeen Hearing Mon 01/14 2:02 PM
Hearing Scheduled STATUS CONFERENCE Related [+] Hearing scheduled 2/5/2019 at 03:00 PM at Telephonic Hrg with Judge Shodeen.(jmk)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust,12 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant David W. Sinnwell
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
20 20 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/06 3:53 PM
Minute Order Regarding Status Conference Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,12 Answer to Complaint
Friday, October 19, 2018
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/19 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/19/2018. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
18 18 court Hearing Continued or Rescheduled Wed 10/17 2:35 PM
Hearing Rescheduled STATUS CONFERENCE Related [+] Hearing scheduled 11/6/2018 at 02:30 PM at Telephonic Hrg with Judge Shodeen.(jmk)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust,12 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant David W. Sinnwell
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
17 17 order Continue Hearing - Order Tue 10/09 9:39 AM
Docket Text Only Order Regarding Motion to Continue Hearing. Having reviewed the motion and having determined that good cause has been established and the requirements contained in the Notice and Order Regarding Hearing having been met, the Court hereby grants the motion. A separate notice of hearing will be docketed to schedule the new hearing date. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this docket text only order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to the case. Related [+]. (mrw)
Related: [-] 16
court Corrective Entry Tue 10/09 9:11 AM
Corrective Entry Incorrect docket code and duplicate filing. See Docket # 16. Related [+](mrw)
Related: [-] 14 Motion filed by Defendant David W. Sinnwell,15 Motion filed by Defendant David W. Sinnwell
Monday, October 08, 2018
16 16 motion Continue Hearing Tue 10/09 9:10 AM
Motion to Continue Hearin Related [+] Filed by Todd M Lantz on behalf of David W. Sinnwell (mrw)
Related: [-] 13 Hearing Set13
15 15 motion motion Mon 10/08 2:43 PM
Error: Incorrect docket code and duplicate filing. See Docket # 16. Motion to Continue Telephonic Hearing on Status Conference (Unresisted) Filed by Todd M Lantz on behalf of David W. Sinnwell (Lantz, Todd) Modified on 10/9/2018 (mrw)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion motion Mon 10/08 2:40 PM
Error: Incorrect docket code and duplicate filing. See Docket # 16. Motion to Continue Telephonic Hearing on Status Conference (Unresisted) Filed by Todd M Lantz on behalf of David W. Sinnwell (Lantz, Todd) Modified on 10/9/2018 (mrw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
13 13 court Judge Shodeen Hearing Tue 09/25 4:12 PM
Hearing Scheduled STATUS CONFERENCE Related [+] Hearing scheduled 10/9/2018 at 03:00 PM at Telephonic Hrg with Judge Shodeen.(jmk)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust,12 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant David W. Sinnwell
Thursday, September 20, 2018
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/20 4:07 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by David W. Sinnwell. (Lantz, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 08/13 4:32 PM
Summons Service Executed On David W. Sinnwell 8/13/2018 (mcn)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate Of Service Mon 08/13 4:15 PM
Error: Incorrect docket code. See docket Event #11. Certificate Of Service Filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust Related [+]. (Schrieber, Gregory) Modified on 8/13/2018 (mcn)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued
court Corrective Entry Mon 08/13 4:31 PM
Corrective Entry Incorrect docket code Related [+](mcn)
Related: [-] 10 Certificate Of Service filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust
Thursday, August 09, 2018
9 9 misc Certificate Of Service Thu 08/09 4:06 PM
Certificate Of Service Filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust Related [+]. (Eganhouse, Michael)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
8 8 order Appear Pro Hac Vice - Order Thu 08/09 9:54 AM
Docket Text Order Regarding Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jerome R. Kerkman). Having reviewed the motion and having determined it complies with applicable federal statutes and rules, the Court hereby Orders that: The motion is granted. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to the case. Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 3
7 7 order Appear Pro Hac Vice - Order Thu 08/09 9:53 AM
Docket Text Order Regarding Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Gregory M. Schrieber). Having reviewed the motion and having determined it complies with applicable federal statutes and rules, the Court hereby Orders that: The motion is granted. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to the case. Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate Of Service Wed 08/08 7:05 PM
Certificate Of Service Filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust Related [+]. (Eganhouse, Michael)
Related: [-] 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust,3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
5 5 court Summons Issued (Judge Shodeen) Tue 08/07 12:39 PM
Summons and Notice Issued On David W. Sinnwell Answer Due 09/6/2018. Execution of Summons Due 08/14/2018. No Answer Deadline: 10/16/2018. No Answer/Execution Deadline: 12/5/2018.(ccc)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Support Document Tue 08/07 11:32 AM
Support Document Filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust Related [+]. (Eganhouse, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust
Monday, August 06, 2018
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/06 8:18 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Michael S Eganhouse on behalf of John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust (Eganhouse, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/06 8:14 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Michael S Eganhouse on behalf of John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust (Eganhouse, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/06 4:54 PM
Adversary case 18-30037 Complaint by John Michael Maier, as Trustee for the Dahl's Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust against David W. Sinnwell. Fee Amount $350 (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Lead Case No. 4:18-bk-1146 (Eganhouse, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint in District Court