California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Carolyn K Delaney
Case #: 2:18-cv-02163
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2018
Terminated:Sep 14, 2018
Last checked: Monday Feb 04, 2019 12:36 AM PST
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Holdings, Inc.
Defendant
Smith & Nephew, LTD
Defendant
Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By
John W. Shaw
Shaw, Koepke And Satter
contact info
Litsa Georgantopoulos
Shaw Koepke & Satter
contact info
Defendant
Smith & Nephew United, Inc.
Defendant
Smith & Nephew TE II, LLC
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Snats, Inc.
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Rolyan, Inc.
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Richards, Inc.
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Orthopedics, LTD.
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Donjoy, Inc.
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Casting, Inc.
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Biotherapeutics
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Ahp, Inc.
Defendant
Smith & Nephew
Defendant
Bioventus, LLC
Plaintiff
Kathryn Stranger-McGorrin
Represented By
Steven M. Heller
Law Offices Of Steven M. Heller
contact info

GPO Sep 13 2018
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/13/2018 ORDERING the deadline to respond to original complaint is EXTENDED to 9/14/2018. (Washington, S)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 14, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/14 4:04 PM
CASE CLOSED pursuant to9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 13, 2018
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/13 3:11 PM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Kathryn Stranger-McGorrin. (Heller, Steven)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 09/13 12:13 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/13/2018 ORDERING the deadline to respond to original complaint is EXTENDED to 9/14/2018. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 09/13 9:38 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by an Additional Two (2) Days by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 08/29 3:10 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by an Additional 14 Days by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 08/15 4:26 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Fourteen Days by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
4 4 service Certificate of Service Fri 08/10 9:52 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for JAM Wed 08/08 2:02 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 Order re Filing Requirements,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/08 1:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/08 1:09 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2016 00198219 by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7802169)(Shaw, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet