Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc. v. McKesson Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45919 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 3:18-cv-02534 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:24 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/15/2019 2:32 PM EDT |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Case from San Francisco Superior with jury demand. Their case number is CGC-18-564743. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12310833)(no process). Filed by McKesson Corporation.(Shin, Clara) Modified on 4/30/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 223 pgs Exhibit 1 - Docket, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation re1 Notice of Removal, (Shin, Clara) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re1 Notice of Removal,(Shin, Clara) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal and Proof of Service | ||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McKesson Corporation.. (Shafroth, Nathan) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
9 | 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/14/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
10 | 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for August 7, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by July 31, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
11 | 11 Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc re1 Notice of Removal.(Lee, Jae) Modified on 5/15/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Jae Lee, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 | ||
12 | 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Purdue Holdings L.P. for Purdue Pharma L.P.; Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Lee, Jae) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
13 | 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc (Lee, Jae) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
14 | 14 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc(Lee, Jae) Modified on 5/15/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Appendix A | ||
15 | 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc re13 Certificate of Interested Entities,14 Notice (Other),11 Notice (Other),12 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Lee, Jae) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/15/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
17 | 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/2018.(jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
18 | 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2018. Judge Alsup's standing orders may be downloaded from the Court's web page at: www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
19 | 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc. (Boland, Little Fawn) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Saturday, May 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20 MOTION to Remand filed by Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 6/11/2018. Replies due by 6/18/2018.(Boland, Little Fawn) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Press Release, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. PPV Contract, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. 3/7/18 MDL Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4. 5/17/18 MDL Order, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
21 | 21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 6/12/2018. Replies due by 6/19/2018.(Shafroth, Nathan) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
22 | 22 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/31/2018. (knmS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
23 | 23 Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
24 | 24 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
25 | 25 Renotice motion hearing re20 MOTION to Remand filed byConsolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc.. (Boland, Little Fawn) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
Reset Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | ||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
26 | 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byConsolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc..(Boland, Little Fawn) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Little Fawn Boland, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1. MDL 2804 Order, 12 14-2017 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2. MDL 2804 Order, 2 16-2018 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3. MDL 2804 Order, 5-17-2018 | ||
27 | 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byPurdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(Lee, Jae) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byMcKesson Corporation.(Shafroth, Nathan) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Lori White, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Rebecca Van Tassell, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 | ||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29 Renotice motion hearing re21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
30 | 30 REPLY filed byConsolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc..(Boland, Little Fawn) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Little Fawn Boland, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1. Settlement Agreement and Release, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2. Order Regarding State Court Coordination | ||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
Reset Deadlines as to21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation . Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | ||
31 | 31 REPLY filed byMcKesson Corporation.(Shafroth, Nathan) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 | ||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
32 | 32 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE HEARING RE21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ,20 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
33 | 33 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the hearing re Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand and Defendants' Motions to Stay Proceedings scheduled for 7/12/2018. The Court will issue a written ruling. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
34 | 34 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/16/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (fabS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | ||
35 | 35 MDL TRANSFER ORDER, TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION, MDL. No. 2804. (fabS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.] | |
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
36 | 36 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 3:18-cv-02534. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |