Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Barbara Mg Lynn
Case #: 3:18-cv-02081
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2018
Terminated:Feb 12, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 05, 2019 2:56 AM CST
Defendant
Holy Yoga Foundation
Represented By
Marian Merise Zapata-Rossa
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Voss
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Walker Field Crowson
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Holy Yoga Global LLC
Represented By
Marian Merise Zapata-Rossa
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Voss
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Walker Field Crowson
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Danette Galvis
Represented By
Sonja J McGill
Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP
contact info
Katherine Rose Beaird
Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
ADR Provider
Terminated: 01/14/2019
Represented By
Christopher Marc Nolland
Law Office Of Christopher Nolland
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
16 16 misc Stipulation Tue 02/12 6:16 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Danette Galvis. (McGill, Sonja)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Wed 02/13 10:44 AM
Civil Case Terminated per16 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (mla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 02/05 3:29 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Extend Time. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to file dismissal papers is extended to 2/11/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/5/2019) (mla)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
14 14 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/04 1:49 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time File Dismissal Papers filed by Danette Galvis (Beaird, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/15 12:58 PM
Letter from the Court to Counsel Regarding Settlement; dismissal papers due by 1/29/2019. (Signed by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/15/2019) (zkc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
12 12 adr ADR Summary Mon 01/14 12:37 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Christopher Nolland. Attorneys in Attendance: Sonja J. McGill, Katie R. Beaird, Marian Zapata-Rossa. Prv Fee: $ $5,600.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Nolland, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 26, 2018
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/26 1:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for jury trial on this Court's three-week docket beginning 9/16/2019 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 1/28/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2019. Motions due by 5/31/2019. All fact and expert discovery due by 4/30/2019. Settlement Status Report due by 1/28/2019. Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2019. Pretrial Materials due by 8/26/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/26/2018) (epm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/13 1:24 PM
ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marian Zapata-Rossa. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/13/2018) (zkc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
9 9 misc Status Report Thu 11/08 3:52 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Danette Galvis. (McGill, Sonja)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 05, 2018
8 8 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/05 11:35 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9562788) filed by Holy Yoga Foundation, Holy Yoga Global LLCAttorney Marian Merise Zapata-Rossa added to party Holy Yoga Foundation(pty:dft), Attorney Marian Merise Zapata-Rossa added to party Holy Yoga Global LLC(pty:dft) (Zapata-Rossa, Marian) (Main Document 8 and part 2 replaced to flatten image on 11/5/2018) (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing - CA,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 18, 2018
7 7 5 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Thu 10/18 4:54 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/8/2018. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/18/2018) (zkc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 10/01 5:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Holy Yoga Foundation, Holy Yoga Global LLC. (Voss, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/01 5:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Holy Yoga Foundation, Holy Yoga Global LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Voss, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 08/10 8:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Holy Yoga Foundation, Holy Yoga Global LLC. (mcrd/ala)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 09, 2018
3 3 qcref Lynn Fri 08/10 8:28 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 08/09 4:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Danette Galvis. (McGill, Sonja)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/09 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Holy Yoga Foundation, Holy Yoga Global, LLC filed by Danette Galvis. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9373513) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McGill, Sonja)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet