Oregon District Court
Judge:Amy M Baggio
Case #: 3:18-cv-01477
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:203 Equal Pay Act
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 05, 2019 12:36 AM PST
Defendant
Nike, Inc.
Represented By
Kennon H. Scott
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Zachary P. Hutton
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Felicia A. Davis
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Amy Joseph Pedersen
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Daniel Prince
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Cahill
Represented By
Anna Marie Joyce
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
India Lin Bodien
India Lin Bodien, Attorney At Law
contact info
Katharine L. Fisher
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Brittany M. Simpson
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
David B. Markowitz
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Byron Goldstein
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Laura L. Ho
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Harry B. Wilson
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Barry Goldstein
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
James P. Kan
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Craig Ackermann
Ackermann & Tilajef PC
contact info
Laura R. Salerno Owens
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Johnston
Represented By
Anna Marie Joyce
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
India Lin Bodien
India Lin Bodien, Attorney At Law
contact info
Katharine L. Fisher
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Brittany M. Simpson
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
David B. Markowitz
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Byron Goldstein
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Laura L. Ho
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Harry B. Wilson
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Barry Goldstein
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
James P. Kan
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Craig Ackermann
Ackermann & Tilajef PC
contact info
Laura R. Salerno Owens
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lindsay Elizabeth
Represented By
Anna Marie Joyce
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
India Lin Bodien
India Lin Bodien, Attorney At Law
contact info
Katharine L. Fisher
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Brittany M. Simpson
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
David B. Markowitz
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Byron Goldstein
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Laura L. Ho
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Harry B. Wilson
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Barry Goldstein
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
James P. Kan
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Craig Ackermann
Ackermann & Tilajef PC
contact info
Laura R. Salerno Owens
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Hender
Represented By
Anna Marie Joyce
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
India Lin Bodien
India Lin Bodien, Attorney At Law
contact info
Katharine L. Fisher
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Brittany M. Simpson
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
David B. Markowitz
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Byron Goldstein
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Laura L. Ho
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Harry B. Wilson
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info
Barry Goldstein
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
James P. Kan
Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho
contact info
Craig Ackermann
Ackermann & Tilajef PC
contact info
Laura R. Salerno Owens
Markowitz Herbold PC
contact info

GPO Feb 26 2019
Findings & Recommendation: Defendant's partial Motion to Dismiss or alternatively to Strike 47 should be denied. Signed on 2/26/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
GPO May 16 2019
ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation 64. Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class and Collective Action Allegation Complaint 47 is Denied. Signed on 5/16/19 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
GPO Mar 23 2020
ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to compel (as stated in their letter to the Court dated March 4, 2020) is Granted. Defendant shall produce names and employee ID numbers of employees and witnesses in already produced employment data and workplace complaint documents. All production pursuant to this motion is subject to the Protective Order 82 entered in this case on June 17, 2019, with the additional requirement that any contacted employee shall first be informed of a right to refuse to talk at this stage of the proceedings. Signed on 3/23/20 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
GPO Aug 10 2020
ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to compel (as stated in their letter to the Court dated June 30, 2020) is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Signed on 8/10/20 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
GPO Oct 09 2020
ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to compel (as stated in their letter to the Court dated August 7, 2020) is Denied. Signed on 10/9/20 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
GPO Nov 15 2020
ORDER: The Court Affirms Magistrate Judge Russo's Order 99. (Corrected entry to include PDF attachment of signed order.) Signed on 11/15/20 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
GPO Nov 17 2020
AMENDED ORDER: The Court Affirms Magistrate Judge Russo's Order 99. Signed on 11/17/20 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
GPO Sep 30 2022
Findings & Recommendation: Defendant's Motion to Seal 171 should be granted in part and denied in part as stated herein. The non-party media organizations' Motion to Intervene 205 should be granted to the extent they request intervention for the limited purpose of challenging the parties' stipulated redactions in regard to the briefing surrounding plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and denied in all other respects with leave to renew. Signed on 9/30/22 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
GPO Nov 13 2022
ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation 273. Defendant's Motion to Seal 171 is Granted in part and Denied in part and the non-party media organizations' Motion to Intervene 205 are Granted to the extent that they requested intervention for the limited purpose of challenging the parties' stipulated redactions in regard to the briefing surrounding plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Denied in all other respects with leave to renew. Signed on 11/13/22 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
GPO Nov 22 2022
Findings & Recommendation: Plaintiffs' motion to certify the class 146 should be denied. Defendant's motions to exclude the opinions of Kathleen Lundquist and David Neumark 179 & 181 should be denied. Plaintiffs' motions to rule as inadmissible parts of Chester Hanvey's and Ali Saad's expert reports 192 & 221 should be denied. Signed on 11/22/22 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
GPO Mar 21 2023
ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation 310. Defendant's Motions to Exclude the Opinions of Kathleen Lundquist and David Neumark 179, 181 are Denied, Plaintiffs' Motions to Rule as Inadmissible Parts of the Expert Reports of Chester Hanvey and Ali Saad 192, 221 are Denied, and Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify the Class 146 is Denied. Signed on 3/21/23 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
GPO Dec 28 2023
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS: It is Ordered that Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Opt-In Plaintiffs 398 is Granted and this action as to Opt-in Plaintiffs Tracee Cheng, Samantha Phillips, Cindy Linebaugh, Paige Azavedo, Donna Olson, Lauren Anderson, Emily Tucker, Jessica Junkins, Christina Baumel, and Jessica Westerhof is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 12/28/23 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
GPO Apr 08 2024
ORDER: The Court Affirms Magistrate Judge Russo's Order 431. Signed on 4/8/24 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
GPO Apr 26 2024
ORDER: Based on the parties Joint Stipulation 477, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 455 is Withdrawn. Signed on 4/26/24 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
GPO Jun 20 2024
ORDER: The Court Affirms Magistrate Judge Russo's Order 480. Signed on 6/20/24 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
GPO Oct 22 2024
Russo's Order 523. Signed on 10/22/2024 by Judge Amy M. Baggio. (jp)OPINION & ORDER: Judge Russo's August 26, 2024, Order 521 applied the correct legal standard under Rule 26 and did not make any clearly erroneous factual findings. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request to modify Judge
GPO Feb 05 2025
OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, even considering the strong presumption in favor of public access to court records, the Court finds good cause and compelling reasons exist and the Court GRANTS Defendant's Motions to Redact (ECF 548, 551, 581, 5825, and 584). To be clear, the Courts decision as to redactions of prior hearings analyzed in this Opinion and Order are not preclusive determinations of requests to redact or seal the courtroom as to future hearings. The Court will analyze any future request to seal or redact in its particular context, mindful that this case is now in the trial phase and binding precedent determines that the compelling reasons standard presumptively applies moving forward. See Ctr. for Auto Safety, 809 F.3d at 1099. The October 9, 2024, and December 13, 2024, hearing transcripts are ORDERED to be made available with the redactions as requested in Defendant's Motions. Signed on 2/5/2025 by Judge Amy M. Baggio. (jp)

1. Nike hit with gender discrimination lawsuit (foxnews.com)
Submitted Mon 08/13/2018
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
633 633 order Order Tue 04/15 8:25 AM
ORDER: Having considered the parties Joint Status Report April 11, 2005(ECF 630), the Court extends the deadline for the parties to jointly update the Court regarding their progress resolving the putative class claims until May 16, 2025. Ordered by Judge Amy M. Baggio. (jp)
Related: [-]
632 632 order Order Tue 04/15 8:23 AM
ORDER: Having considered the parties Joint Status Report Regarding Nike's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (ECF 629), the Court extends the deadline for the parties to jointly update the Court regarding resolution of the Attorneys' fees motion an additional 21 days to May 2, 2025. The stay on the Attorney's fees motion (ECF 574) remains in effect. Ordered by Judge Amy M. Baggio. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
630 630 oth_doc Joint Status Report Fri 04/11 5:07 PM
Joint Status Report - April 11, 2025 . Filed by Kelly Cahill, Lindsay Elizabeth, Heather Hender, Sara Johnston. (Denlinger, Brian)
Related: [-]
629 629 oth_doc Joint Status Report Fri 04/11 3:57 PM
Joint Status Report Regarding NIKE's Motion for Attorneys' Fees [ECF No. 567] . Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Prince, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
631 631 appeal Mandate of USCA Mon 04/14 3:54 PM
MANDATE of the 9th Circuit, USCA #24-165, re Notice of Appeal,406 . The decision of the District Court is: AFFIRMED. (dino)
Related: [-]