Grace v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45935 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:18-cv-10857 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:24 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Plaintiff
Edward Grace
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:55 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 94 pgs COMPLAINT against Endo Health Solutions Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7119884 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Edward Grace.(Strawbridge, Patrick) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis plc, Actavis, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William S. Consovoy, Thomas R. McCarthy, Michael H. Park, Rafey S. Balabanian, Benjamin H. Richman, Todd Logan, Eli Wade-Scott, Ashley C. Keller, Travis Lenkner, and Seth A. Meyer Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-7176174 by Edward Grace.(Strawbridge, Patrick) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of R. Balabanian, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of W. Consovoy, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of A. Keller, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of T. Lenkner, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of T. Logan, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of T. McCarthy, | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of S. Meyer, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of M. Park, | ||
Att: 9 Certificate of B. Richman, | ||
Att: 10 Certificate of E. Wade-Scott | ||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 12, 2018 to File Responsive Pleading by Cardinal Health, Inc..(Mitchell, Brendan) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William S. Consovoy, Thomas R. McCarthy, Michael H. Park, Rafey S. Balabanian, Benjamin H. Richman, Todd Logan, Eli Wade-Scott, Ashley C. Keller, Travis Lenkner, and Seth A. Meyer Filing fee: by Plaintiff Edward Grace. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0101-7177240. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Strawbridge, Patrick) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
7 | 7 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William S. Consovoy, Thomas R. McCarthy, Michael H. Park, Rafey S. Balabanian, Benjamin H. Richman, Todd Logan, Eli Wade-Scott, Ashley C. Keller, Travis Lenkner, and Seth A. Meyer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Belmont, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
8 | 8 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting5 Joint Motion to Extend Due Date. Defendants Cardinal Health, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation and McKesson Corporation shall file an answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, on or before the close of business on Thursday, July 12, 2018. (MacDougall, Patricia) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 12, 2018 to File Responsive Pleading by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc..(Paige, Sarah) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting9 Joint Motion to Extend Due Date. Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Watson Laboratories shall each file an answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, on or before the close of business on Thursday, July 12, 2018. (MacDougall, Patricia) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
11 | 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Paige, Sarah) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Due Date for Responsive Pleadings to 30 Days Beyond JDML Decision by Cardinal Health, Inc..(Mitchell, Brendan) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting12 Joint Motion to Continue Due Date. Defendants Cardinal Health, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, and McKesson Corporation each shall file an answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, within thirty (30) days after the issuance of the final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation concerning the transfer of this matter. (MacDougall, Patricia) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
14 | 14 STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Paige, Sarah) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: Stipulation14 . Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc. shall have through and including thirty (30) days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's final decision whether to transfer this case to the MDL Proceeding in the Northern District Ohio to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint.(MacDougall, Patricia) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Hawkins on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Hawkins, Christopher) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brendan P. Mitchell (Mitchell, Brendan) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
19 | 19 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order in MDL Case 2804 received from District of Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Belmont, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
20 | 20 Case transferred to to District of Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 8/2/2018. Electronic file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. (Belmont, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 8/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
21 | 21 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:18-cv-10857. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |