County Commission of Mingo County v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45940 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 2:18-cv-00476 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:25 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West Virginia Board of Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Plaintiff
County Commission of Mingo County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:53 PM EDT |
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, McKesson Corporation with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mingo County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6326546. (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 112 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cardinal Health 110, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., McKesson Corporation, The County Commission of Mingo County (Ruby, Steven) (Modified on 3/28/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filers) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
4 | 4 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, McKesson Corporation to Stay(Ruby, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:5 EMERGENCY MOTION by The County Commission of Mingo County to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mingo County. ERROR: Memorandum filed as attachment to the motion. CORRECTION: Memorandum removed and filed at entry #6. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | ||
5 | 5 Emergency MOTION by County Commission of Mingo County to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mingo County (Chafin, H.) (Modified on 3/30/2018 to remove memorandum filed as attachment (attachment #1) to the motion and file at entry #6) (kp).[Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
6 | 6 20 pgs MEMORANDUM by The County Commission of Mingo County in support of5 EMERGENCY MOTION by The County Commission of Mingo County to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mingo County. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 RESPONSE by The County Commission of Mingo County in opposition to4 MOTION by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, McKesson Corporation to Stay (Chafin, H.) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 RESPONSE by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, McKesson Corporation in opposition to5 EMERGENCY MOTION by The County Commission of Mingo County to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mingo County (Ruby, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 REPLY by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, McKesson Corporation to7 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Ruby, Steven) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 REPLY by The County Commission of Mingo County to8 Response In Opposition. (Young, James) (Modified on 4/20/2018 to remove link to #5 motion) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia (WVSD) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, June 11, 2018 . Complete information regarding the WVSD NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at[LINK:h ttp://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information] . Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVSD e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after June 11, 2018. Please log in to the WVSD CM/ECF system at [LINK:http://ecf.wv sd.uscourts.gov] before June 7, 2018 to make sure you know your current WVSD e-filing login and password. Do not rely on your username and password being saved in your web browser, because that method will not work with the NextGen upgrade. If you do not know your login or password or have any additional questions please call the WVSD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304)-347-3111. (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia (WVSD) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, June 11, 2018 . The WVSD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00pm (noon) on Friday, June 8, 2018 until 6:00am on Monday, June 11, 2018 . Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVSD e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after June 11, 2018. Instructions for linking your account can be found at[LINK:http://www.wvsd. uscourts.gov/pdfs/NextGen/WVSD_Link_PACER_to_CM-ECF.pdf] . If you have any additional questions please call the WVSD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304)-347-3111. (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Transfer Order MDL 2804. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 TRANSFER ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on 8/02/2018. (cc: attys) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/9/2018.] | |
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00476. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |