Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:18-ap-50227
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2018
Terminated:Jul 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gregg Appliances, Inc., Defendant
4151 East 96th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46250
Represented By
Gregg Appliances, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Gregg, Defendant
Attn: Thomas C. Scherer 2700 Market Tower 10 West Market Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Gregg
contact info
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Defendant
Attn: Jay Jaffe 600 East 96th Street Suite 600
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
contact info
Defendant
GACP Finance Co., LLC, Defendant
Attn: Jay Jaffe 600 East 96th Street Suite 600
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
GACP Finance Co., LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
WGT V, llc, Plaintiff
John R. Humphrey Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP One Indiana Square, Suite 3500
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Michael P. O'Neil
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
John R. Humphrey
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, July 17, 2020
174 174 court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/17 8:24 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:18-ap-50227 Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
173 173 order Appeal: Notice of District Court Ruling Fri 07/10 1:02 PM
Notice of District Court Ruling by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson (District Court Case Number: 1:20-cv-1299-JMS-DML) Related [+]. (see)
Related: [-] 168
172 172 order Appeal: Notice of District Court Ruling Fri 07/10 1:00 PM
Notice of District Court Ruling by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson (District Court Case Number: 1:19-cv-5038-JMS-DML) Related [+]. (see)
Related: [-] 113