Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-24404

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:G Michael Halfenger
Case #: 2:18-ap-02177
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2018
Terminated:Jan 29, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Neuroscience Group of Northeast Wisconsin, SC
1305 West American Drive
Neenah, WI 54956
Represented By
Neuroscience Group of Northeast Wisconsin, SC
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela M Read
247 Sullivan Street, Apt. 404
Oshkosh, WI 54902
Represented By
John W. Menn
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/29 4:33 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:18-ap-2177 Stipulation (amb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/29 4:35 PM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-2177 Closed (amb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
11 11 misc Proposed Order Tue 01/22 10:38 AM
Proposed Order RE:10 - Stipulation filed by Attorney John W. Menn of Steinhilber Swanson LLP on behalf of Angela M Read. (Menn, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation to Dismiss
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 01/22 10:36 AM
Stipulation By Angela M Read and Neuroscience Group Filed by Angela M Read (Menn, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
court Hearing Continued (Adv Other) Mon 01/07 3:07 PM
Pursuant to a telephone request from Mr. Menn and Mr. Phelan, the January 14 pretrial hearing and hearing on the plaintiff's motion for default judgment is adjourned to February 4, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-684-8852, and enter access code 7183566 before the scheduled hearing time. Hearing Continued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/04/2019 at 01:00 PM at United States Courthouse at 517 East Wisconsin Avenue, Room 133, Milwaukee, Wisconsin. (saa)
Related: [-] 4 Electronic Summons Issued
Saturday, December 29, 2018
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/30 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 12/29/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, December 27, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing (Chambers GMH) Thu 12/27 12:22 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 1/14/2019 at 01:00 PM Telephone Hearing for6 , You may appear by telephone or in person. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-684-8852, and enter access code 7183566 before the scheduled hearing time. (saa, Law Clerk)
Related: [-] 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment
court Court Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/27 12:44 PM
Court Certificate of Mailing. I certify that on today's date, I served by first class mail, postage prepaid, a copy of the related document on:Jenny KohlPatient Accounts Team Leader, Neuroscience Group, 1305 W. American Drive, Neenah, WI 54956 Related [+]. (amb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
7 7 answer Objection Wed 12/26 2:51 PM
Objection Filed by Defendant Neuroscience Group of Northeast Wisconsin, SC Related [+] (cmn, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Angela M Read
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
court Hearing Continued (Adv Other) Tue 12/11 8:43 AM
On December 10, 2018, the plaintiff filed a motion for default judgment. Accordingly, the December 17, 2018 pretrial conference is adjourned to January 14, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-684-8852, and enter access code 7183566 before the scheduled hearing time. Hearing Continued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/14/2019 at 01:00 PM at United States Courthouse at 517 East Wisconsin Avenue, Room 133, Milwaukee, Wisconsin. (saa)
Related: [-] 4 Electronic Summons Issued
Monday, December 10, 2018
6 6 motion Default Judgment Mon 12/10 3:49 PM
Motion for Default Judgment with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Angela M Read Objections due by 12/24/2018. (Menn, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/17 8:46 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Angela M Read Related [+] (Menn, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Angela M Read,4 Electronic Summons Issued
4 4 court Electronic Summons Issued Wed 10/17 7:45 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 11/16/2018. United States and its offices and agencies answer due by 11/21/2018. Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:00 PM at Telephone Hearing. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-684-8852, and enter access code 7183566 before the scheduled hearing time. (saa, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
utility Court Minutes/Order (GMH Virtual Event) Tue 10/16 10:43 PM
ORDER: On August 13, 2018, the court issued a summons and the plaintiff filed a certificate of service stating that the plaintiff served the defendant. The court has reviewed the certificate of service and it does not demonstrate that the plaintiff served the defendant as required by Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7004(b)(3) because the plaintiff did not serve the defendant, a domestic corporation, "by mailing a copy of the summons and complaint to the attention of an officer, a managing or general agent, or to any other agent authorized by appointment or by law to receive service of process". Accordingly, the October 22, 2018, pretrial hearing is canceled. The court will issue another summons with another date for a pretrial conference and plaintiff must properly serve defendant as required by Rule 7004. Related [+]. (Halfenger, G.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Angela M Read,2 Electronic Summons Issued,3 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Angela M Read
Monday, August 13, 2018
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 08/13 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Angela M Read Related [+] (Menn, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Angela M Read,2 Electronic Summons Issued
2 2 court Electronic Summons Issued Mon 08/13 2:26 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 9/12/2018. United States and its offices and agencies answer due by 9/17/2018. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 02:00 PM by Telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-684-8852, and enter access code 7183566 before the scheduled hearing time. (srh, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/10 11:45 AM
Adversary case 18-02177 Complaint by Angela M Read (attorney John W. Menn) against Neuroscience Group of Northeast Wisconsin, SC. Receipt Number waived, Fee Amount $350 (72 (Injunctive relief - other),02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Menn, John)
Related: [-]