Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11375

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50691
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2018
Terminated:Dec 21, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
TK Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
TK Holdings, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC
Represented By
Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael O'Boyle
Represented By
Duane David Werb
Werb & Sullivan
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Messner
Represented By
Duane David Werb
Werb & Sullivan
contact info
Plaintiff
Don Schiemann
Represented By
Duane David Werb
Werb & Sullivan
contact info
Plaintiff
Shan Cong
Represented By
Duane David Werb
Werb & Sullivan
contact info
Plaintiff
Alby Berman
Represented By
Duane David Werb
Werb & Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, December 21, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/21 10:07 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50691 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 08, 2018
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/09 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/08/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, December 06, 2018
4 4 order Dismissing Case Thu 12/06 4:06 PM
Order Dismissing Case Related [+] Signed on 12/6/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
3 3 notice Notice and Order of Request for Status Report Tue 11/13 1:20 PM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report with Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 12/4/2018. Signed on 11/13/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 08/10 4:43 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50691 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8972476, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 08/10 4:41 PM
Adversary case 18-50691 Complaint by Michael O'Boyle, Thomas Messner, Don Schiemann, Shan Cong, Alby Berman against TK Holdings, Inc., Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). AP Summons Served due date: 11/8/2018. (Werb, Duane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B