Caruso v. Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50229 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Aug 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 30, 2020 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Thu 01/30 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 292910. (TW) |
||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/22 9:02 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:18-ap-50229 Closed. (lak) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Tue 01/14 3:04 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Amy E Vulpio, Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso, Defendant Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
court
Minute Entry/Order Continued
Tue 10/15 1:16 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Status conference1 . Disposition: Status conference not held. Matter continued to 11/20/2019 at 01:30 PM EST in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
court
Minute Entry/Order Continued
Mon 09/23 2:41 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Status conference18 . Disposition: Status conference not held. Matter continued to 10/16/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
court
Minute Entry/Order Continued
Wed 08/28 8:06 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Status conference1 . Disposition: Status conference not held. Matter continued to 09/25/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
court
Minute Entry/Order Continued
Tue 07/23 10:02 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Status conference not held. Matter continued by agreement of the parties. Status conference to be held on 08/28/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
court
Minute Entry/Order Continued
Mon 06/17 3:45 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Status conference. Disposition: not held. Parties request that the status conference be continued to 07/24/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
court
Minute Entry/Order Continued
Mon 05/13 9:52 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Complaint1 . Disposition: Status conference not held. Parties request that the status conference be continued to 06/19/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 04/17 12:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 04/17/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (306958)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 03/14 10:48 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 03/13/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (305725)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/13 2:12 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/13/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (304381)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 01/16 3:21 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/16/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (303005)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 12/13 2:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 12/12/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (301697)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding or Count, Order on Motion to
Fri 11/30 12:36 PM
Order Mooting Motion to Dismiss . The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 11/15 8:27 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 11/14/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (300524)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc.
Mon 10/22 9:03 AM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 11/14/2018 at 01:30 PM EST via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/08 4:12 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Amy E Vulpio on behalf of Defendant Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc . (Vulpio, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/25 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service re: Amended Complaint, filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso . (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Amended Complaint
Mon 09/24 4:40 PM
Amended Complaint (no parties added), filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso . (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Appearance
Wed 09/12 10:34 AM
Appearance filed by Amy E Vulpio on behalf of Defendant Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc. (Vulpio, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 09/11 1:07 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding or Count . Deficiency to be cured by 9/25/2018. (lak) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 09/11 10:19 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Amy E Vulpio on behalf of Defendant Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Alphabet Inc.]. (Vulpio, Amy) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding or Count, Motion to
Tue 09/11 10:15 AM
Motion to Dismiss Count Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) with Brief in Support, filed by Amy E Vulpio on behalf of Defendant Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc. Response and Brief due by 10/09/2018. (Vulpio, Amy) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Mon 08/20 11:12 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc . (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 08/13 3:43 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 08/27/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 9/12/2018. (lak) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 08/13 11:20 AM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/13 11:14 AM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50229 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) Google LLC f/d/b/a Google Inc. (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Theisen, Meredith) |