California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:18-cv-04912
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Feb 09, 2019 1:41 AM PST
Defendant
Elon Musk
Represented By
Dean S. Kristy
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Mara Rachelle Ludmer
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
Represented By
Dean S. Kristy
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Mara Rachelle Ludmer
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Yeager
Represented By
Joseph Allan Pettigrew
Scott+scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
John T Jasnoch
Scottscott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
Thomas L Laughlin, IV
Scott+scott, Attorneys At Law, LLP
contact info
John T. Jasnoch
Scott+scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FNY Investment Advisers, LLC
Represented By
Marc M. Seltzer
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 27 2018
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 22 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
29 29 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Tue 11/27 12:54 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 22 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Thu 11/29 4:39 PM
Create association: case consolidated, all future filings shall be made in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC. (slhS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
28 28 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/16 9:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2018 re: MOTIONS to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel: 3:18-cv-05258-EMC 24 , 3:18-cv-04912-EMC 22 , 3:18-cv-05463-EMC 32 , 3:18-cv-04876-EMC 22 , 3:18-cv-05899-EMC 19 , 3:18-cv-04939-EMC 22 , 3:18-cv-04865-EMC 46 , 3:18-cv-04865-EMC 71 , 3:18-cv-04865-EMC 40 , 3:18-cv-04865-EMC 64 , 3:18-cv-04865-EMC 80 , 3:18-cv-04865-EMC 47 , 3:18-cv-04865-EMC 41 , 3:18-cv-04948-EMC 21 , 3:18-cv-04865-EMC 45 , 3:18-cv-05470-EMC 24 . Motions taken under submission. Status Report due by 1/10/2019. Status Conference set for 1/17/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 17 Minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorneys: Elizabeth Cabraser, Katherine Lubin, Danielle Myers, Rachel Jensen, Ramsey Abadou, Mario Choi, Laurence King, Frederick Fox, Robert Cappucci, Mark Seltzer, Reed Kathrein. Defendant Attorneys: Dean Kristy, Jennifer Bretan, Ashley Keller, Christopher Keller, Frank Busch. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2018)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
27 27 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 10/10 6:24 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Certificate of Counsel Wed 10/10 5:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Arthur V. Nealon by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Certificate of Counsel Wed 10/10 5:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Andrew J. Entwistle by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Certificate of Counsel Wed 10/10 5:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Robert N. Cappucci by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Certificate of Counsel Wed 10/10 5:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
22 22 motion Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Tue 10/09 4:43 PM
MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018.(Seltzer, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Marc Seltzer In Support of Motion for Appointment,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, September 28, 2018
21 21 8 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 09/28 9:14 AM
Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (31) Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaints and Comtinuing Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines in case 3:18-cv-04865-EMC.Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-04865-EMC, 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 3:18-cv-05470-EMC(afmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
20 20 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 09/26 5:26 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 Clerk's Notice,10 Waiver of Service Executed,9 Waiver of Service Executed,15 Case Management Scheduling Order,1 Complaint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Time For Defendants To Respond To Complaints And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 24, 2018
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 09/24 6:42 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to the Court's unavailability, the Initial Case Management Conference is advanced from 11/8/2018 to 11/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint CMC Statement due date remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 21, 2018
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision Fri 09/21 2:08 PM
AMENDED Clerk's Notice DECLINING Video Recording re: (16 in 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-05470-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 24 in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC) re Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision Fri 09/21 9:53 AM
Clerk's Notice CONSENTING TO Video Recording re: (16 in 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-05470-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 24 in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC) Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request Fri 09/14 11:47 AM
Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 9/21/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 13, 2018
15 15 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 09/13 5:22 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/13 10:34 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
13 13 2 pgs order Order Relating Case Wed 09/12 1:28 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are further related: 18-cv-4876-JST, 18-cv-4865-EMC, 18-cv-4939-EMC, 18-cv-4948-HSG, 18-cv-5258-LHK, 18-cv-5463-VC, and 18-cv-5470-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 09/04 3:46 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Bretan, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/04 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dean S. Kristy Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Kristy, Dean)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/24 2:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Yeager. Service waived by Tesla, Inc. waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Jasnoch, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/24 2:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Yeager. Service waived by Elon Musk waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Jasnoch, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/21 12:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Thomas L. Laughlin, IV by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/20 2:24 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12609192.) filed by John Yeager.(Laughlin, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 08/14 3:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order SEC Class Action Tue 08/14 3:13 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 9/4/2018. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 08:30 AM.(mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 08/14 1:16 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jjbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/14 10:02 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by John Yeager . (Jasnoch, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 08/13 5:09 PM
Proposed Summons. (Jasnoch, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/13 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12591280.). Filed byJohn Yeager.(Jasnoch, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet