City of Jersey City, New Jersey v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45948 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 13, 2018 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 2:18-cv-11210 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:26 PM EST |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Estate of Mortimer Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson
675-G Alpha Drive
Highland Heights, OH 44143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Estate of Raymond Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
CT Corporation System 1300 East Ninth Street
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amerisource Bergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
ABC Manufacturers
|
|
Defendant
ABC Distributors
|
|
Defendant
ABC Corporations
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Jersey City, New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8850277) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CITY OF JERSEY CITY, NEW JERSEY.(CECCHI, JAMES) [Transferred from njd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) [Transferred from njd on 8/13/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, AMERISOURCE BERGEN, CARDINAL HEALTH, CEPHALON, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MCKESSON, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., RITE AID CORPORATION, ESTATE OF MORTIMER SACKLER, ESTATE OF RAYMOND SACKLER, RICHARD SACKLER, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Brian Y. Lawrence* (byl, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of Ohio. (CTO-47 MDL 2804 Judge Dan A. Polster) (gh, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 2:18-cv-11210. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |