Red Lake Band of Chippewa Indians v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45959 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 13, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:18-cv-02107 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:27 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wallgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Dakota Drug, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant/Intervenor
Thrifty Drug Stores, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Red Lake Band of Chippewa Indians
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:26 PM EDT |
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6246829) filed by Red Lake Band of Chippewa Indians. No summons requested. (Peterson, James)[Transferred from mnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 6th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-2107 (JNE/LIB). (KNK) [Transferred from mnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
3 | 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Michael J. Fuller, Jr., Paul T. Farrell, Jr., J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, Archie Lamb, Jeff Link and Anthony J. Majestro as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (KNK) [Transferred from mnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-47) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (AKL) [Transferred from mnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Minnesota. Case number 0:18-cv-02107. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |