Rivers v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45962 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 13, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Northern, 1:18-cv-03116 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:27 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Rivers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:11 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (daj, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | ||
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Actavis Inc., Actavis PLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp., Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | ||
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed by Barbara RIvers; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14418481.(Edelson, Jay) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelson, Jay) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
4 | 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Barbara Rivers by Jay Edelson (Edelson, Jay) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (jn, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | ||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 8/10/2018 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 8/8/2018. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Corp. by James F. Bennett (Bennett, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
7 | 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Corp. by Arsenio Lenell Mims (Mims, Arsenio) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
8 | 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health Inc. by Julie Fix Meyer (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
9 | 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McKesson Corporation by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch (Vesselinovitch, Alexander) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
10 | 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McKesson Corporation by Matthew Thomas Connelly (Connelly, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
11 | 11 MOTION by Defendant Cardinal Health Inc. for extension of time Joint Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time For Distributor Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
12 | 12 Joint Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time For Distributor Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Julie Fix Meyer for presentment of before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/11/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health Inc. by Julie Fix Meyer (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
14 | 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Joint Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time For Distributor Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint11 is granted. No appearance required on 6/11/2018. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Matthew J. Smock (Smock, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
16 | 16 MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for extension of time to file answer (Smock, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
17 | 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Matthew J. Smock / Attorney Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Sherry Knutson (Smock, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
18 | 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Sherry Ann Knutson (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
19 | 19 MOTION by Defendants Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
20 | 20 NOTICE OF MOTION by Defendants Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for extension of time to file response/reply,19 . (Knutson, Sherry) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/22/2018 (jh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
21 | 21 NOTICE of Motion by Sherry Ann Knutson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,19 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/6/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
22 | 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Parties' corrected joint unopposed motion for extension of time for moving defendants to respond to plaintiff complaint19 is granted. No appearance required on 7/9/2018. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
23 | 23 MOTION by Defendant Cardinal Health Inc. to stay Joint Unopposed Motion to Stay Further Proceedings, Responsive Pleading Deadlines, and Initial Disclosures Pending JPML Final Decision (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
24 | 24 NOTICE of Motion by Julie Fix Meyer for presentment of motion to stay23 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/23/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25 STIPULATION / Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (Smock, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
26 | 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Barbara Rivers by Seth Adam Meyer (Meyer, Seth) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
27 | 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Joint Unopposed Motion to Stay Further Proceedings, Responsive Pleading Deadlines, and Initial Disclosures Pending JPML Final Decision23 is granted. This case is stayed. The scheduling conference date of 7/23/2018 is stricken. Status hearing set for 9/7/2018 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2804 Conditional Transfer Order filed 8/9/2018. (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | ||
28 | 28 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
29 | 29 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio the electronic record. (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 8/13/2018.] | |
30 | 30 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-03116. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |