Masterpiece Cakeshop Incorporated et al v. Elenis et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Wiley Y Daniel |
Referred: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02074 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 10, 2019 1:51 AM MST |
Defendant
Philip Weiser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jessica (I) Pocock
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ajay (I) Menon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ajay Menon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rita (I) Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charles (I) Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carol (I) Fabrizio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miguel (I) Rene Elias
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony (I) Aragon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jessica Pocock
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rita Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Aragon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aubrey Elenis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aubrey (I) Elenis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miguel Rene Elias
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carol Fabrizio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charles Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Hickenlooper
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Autumn Scardina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Masterpiece Cakeshop Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Cynthia H. Coffman
Terminated: 01/24/2019
|
Represented By
|
Movant
WW Bridal and American Family Association of PA
Terminated: 10/10/2018
marriageconstitutionrestorationact.com 601 Market St
Bloomsburg,, PA 17815 |
Represented By
|
Movant
National Alliance of Black Pastors
Terminated: 10/10/2018
National Alliance Of Black Pastors Hart Senate Office Building 216
Washington, DC 20002 |
Represented By
|
Movant
Coalition of Doctors Defending Reparative Therapy
Terminated: 10/10/2018
522 Brick Boulevard
Brick, NJ 08723 |
Represented By
|
Movant
Center For Garden State Families
Terminated: 10/10/2018
https://www.gardenstatefamilies.org/ Center For Garden State Families 8 Mary Louise Ave
Ledgewood, NJ 07852 |
Represented By
|
1. | Court Rules Colorado Cannot Block Baker?s Lawsuit Over State?s Hostility Toward His Beliefs (cnsnews.com) |
Submitted Tue 01/08/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |