Jackson County, Missouri v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45965 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Western, 4:18-cv-00571 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:28 PM EST |
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Raymond Sackler Trust
|
|
Defendant
RiteAid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D. A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
SuperValu, Inc. d/b/a Advantage Logistics
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D Smith Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
OrthoMcNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jackson County, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Miami-Luken Inc
Terminated: 01/30/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:34 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 279 pgs COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5867739. Service due by 10/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Dameron, Matthew) [Transferred from mowd on 8/14/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director.(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from mowd on 8/14/2018.] | |
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Judge Beth Phillips, this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Greg Kays for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4 18-00571 CV-W-DGK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri) [Transferred from mowd on 8/14/2018.] | |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-48, from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL No. 2804. Signed on 8/13/2018. Case electronically transferred. (Crocker, Susan) [Transferred from mowd on 8/14/2018.] | |
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western. Case number 4:18-cv-00571. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |