City of Meridian v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45969 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Southern, 3:18-cv-00486 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:28 PM EST |
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
RITE AID CORPORATION
30 HUNTER LN.
CAMP BILL, PA 17011 |
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WALMART INC. F/K/A WALMART STORES, INC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Meridian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:45 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT, WITH JURY DEMAND, against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3766231), filed by City of Meridian.(PKM) [Transferred from mssd on 8/14/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint. (PKM) [Transferred from mssd on 8/14/2018.] | |
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER Staying Telephonic Case Management Conference pending transfer of case to MDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/30/2018. (WG) [Transferred from mssd on 8/14/2018.] | |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. (PKM) [Transferred from mssd on 8/14/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio. (PKM) [Transferred from mssd on 8/14/2018.] | |
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Southern. Case number 3:18-cv-00486. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |