Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:18-bk-19918
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Sep 24, 2018
Claims Deadline:Oct 24, 2018
Terminated:Nov 30, 2023

Debtor
Black Rhino Hurricane Products, LLC
1590 SW 4th Cir
Boca Raton, FL 33486-4413
Represented By
Richard H Simonson, Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Nicole Testa Mehdipour
United States Bankruptcy Trustee 200 East Broward Blvd. Suite 1110
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 08/16/2018 12:02 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 08/15 7:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 18-19918 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32626387. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF] Wed 08/15 6:59 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] (Simonson, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset) Wed 08/15 7:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 09/24/2018 at 08:30 AM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. Proofs of Claim due by 10/24/2018. (Simonson, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Wed 08/15 7:00 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Richard H Simonson Esq. (Simonson, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 08/15 7:00 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Black Rhino Hurricane Products, LLC. (Simonson, Richard)
Related: [-]