Bridge House Corporation v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-07821 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Aug 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 12, 2019 3:07 AM CST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Bridge House Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Receipt
Mon 09/24 12:03 PM
Receipt of Transfer Case to Northern District of Ohio (my) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order of MDL Transfer
Thu 09/13 11:01 AM
Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file sent.(lag) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL
Thu 09/13 10:58 AM
Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (lag) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 08/23 11:07 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re6 Request for Summons Issued,5 Request for Summons Issued. **1.Summons included additional page that is not part of summons form. For future filings, only submit the Summons form which can be found at the courts website. Clerk issued summons without additional page. 2. Summons for Johnson Pharmaceuticals, Inc will not be issued, as they are not a named party.** (jeg) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/23 11:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Noramco, Inc. (jeg) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 08/22 11:22 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint,,. (Stein, Mark) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 08/22 11:21 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Noramco, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint,,. (Stein, Mark) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 08/21 7:35 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/20/2018.(blg) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/17 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(sbs) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Summons, | ||
Att: 17 Summons, | ||
Att: 18 Summons, | ||
Att: 19 Summons, | ||
Att: 20 Summons, | ||
Att: 21 Summons, | ||
Att: 22 Summons | ||
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 08/16 2:55 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/16 2:38 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bridge House Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7064447) filed by Bridge House Corporation.Attorney Mark S. Stein added to party Bridge House Corporation(pty:selreq).(Stein, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Summons, | ||
Att: 17 Summons, | ||
Att: 18 Summons, | ||
Att: 19 Summons, | ||
Att: 20 Summons, | ||
Att: 21 Summons, | ||
Att: 22 Summons, | ||
Att: 23 Summons, | ||
Att: 24 Summons |