Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V. et al. v. Abengoa Mexico S.A. De C.V.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alvin K Hellerstein |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-07505 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 09:207 Application for order confirming award of arbitrators |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 16, 2019 4:45 AM EST |
Defendant
Abengoa Mexico S.A. De C.V.
|
|
Plaintiff
Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 02/28 2:17 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:21 Order in favor of Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V. against Abengoa Mexico S.A. De C.V. in the amount of $15,059,917.00. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated February 28, 2019, Eolica's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 207 is granted. The Arbitration Award in ICDR Case No. 01 16-0004 4305 dated August 9, 2018 is confirmed. Judgement against Respondent in the amount of $11,408,361.38 for liquidated damages, $3,245,526.87 for reimbursement of Petitioners' reasonable costs of the arbitration, as awarded by the panel, and prejudgment interest at 5% compound interest with half-year rests from August 9, 2018 for both sums amounting to $406,028.75, for a total sum of $15,059,917.00, subject to a supplementary judgment adding reasonable attorney's fees. Award, ECF 3-1 Paragraph 8.5, plus post-judgment interest at the statutory rate. 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a). (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/28/2019)(km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
21 | 21
10
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/28 10:38 AM
ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRAL AWARD: Eolica's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 207 is granted. The Arbitration Award in ICDR Case No. 01 16-0004 4305 dated August 9, 2018 is confirmed for the reasons stated above. Judgement against Respondent in the amount of $11,408,361.38 for liquidated damages, $3,245,526.87 for reimbursement of Petitioners' reasonable costs of the arbitration, as awarded by the panel, and prejudgment interest at 5% compound interest with half-year rests from August 9, 2018 for both sums amounting to $406,028.75, for a total sum of $15,059,917.00, subject to a supplementary judgment adding reasonable attorney's fees. Award, ECF 3-1 Paragraph 8.5. The clerk shall award post-judgment interest at the statutory rate. 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a); see, e.g., Trustees for The Mason Tenders Dist. Council Welfare Fund v. Euston St. Servs., Inc., No. 15-cv-6628 (GHW), 2016 WL 67730, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 5, 2016) (citing Westinghouse Credit Corp. v. D'Urso, 371 F.3d 96, 100-01 (2d Cir. 2004)). The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/28/2019) (ne) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 11/29 3:23 PM
ORDER: granting18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Plaintiff shall move for full relief by Dec. 21, 2018. The conf. set for Nov. 30, 2018 is canceled. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/29/2018) (ama) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Thu 11/29 9:09 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. 15 Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines Terminate Hearings
Thu 11/29 3:23 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Motions due by 12/21/2018.), ***Hearings Terminated*** The following hearing(s) was terminated: Initial Conference,. (ama) |
||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Thu 11/29 12:00 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Proposed Default Judgment, Affidavit of Michael Nolan in Support of Proposed Default Judgment, and Statement of Damages served on Rodrigo Solis, Abengoa Mexico S.A. De C.V. on 11/28/2018. Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V.. (Nolan, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 11/28 6:11 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Michael D. Nolan dated November 28, 2018. Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V..(Nolan, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Statement of Damages
Wed 11/28 5:28 PM
STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V..(Nolan, Michael) |
|
16 | 16
respoth
Affidavit in Support (non-motion)
Wed 11/28 5:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Michael D. Nolan in Support re:15 Proposed Default Judgment,. Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V.. (Nolan, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Proposed Default Judgment
Wed 11/28 5:24 PM
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V.. (Nolan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated 11/28/2018 11 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Clerk's Certificate of Default
Wed 11/28 7:49 AM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Abengoa Mexico S.A. De C.V. (km) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Affidavit in Support (non-motion)
Tue 11/27 5:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Michael D. Nolan in Support re:12 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V.. (Nolan, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
Tue 11/27 5:27 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V.. (Nolan, Michael) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers) |
|
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Tue 11/27 5:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 207 served on Rodrigo Solis on November 1, 2018. Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V.. (Nolan, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 11/07 5:24 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conf. is adjourned to Nov. 30, 2018, 10:00 am. Initial Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/7/2018) (ne) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 11/07 1:48 AM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference confirming a foreign arbitral award against Defendant, pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 207 and the 1958 Convention on the Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitral Awards addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Michael D. Nolan dated 11/7/2018. Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V.. Return Date set for 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM.(Nolan, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 10/29 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. It is ORDERED that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/29/2018) (rj) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Thu 10/25 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) |
||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 09/04 4:56 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 09/04 4:56 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 09/04 4:56 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 08/31 5:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nolan, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Judgment
Fri 08/31 5:25 PM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V.. (Nolan, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration
Fri 08/31 5:21 PM
PETITION TO Confirm ARBITRATION..Document filed by Eolica Tres Mesas, S. De R.L. De C.V., Eolica Tres Mesas 2, S. De R.L. De C.V..(Nolan, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 08/29 4:18 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael D. Nolan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: EOLICA TRES MESAS, S. DE R.L. DE C.V., EOLICA TRES MESAS 2, S. DE R.L. DE C.V., ABENGOA MEXICO S.A. DE C.V.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 08/29 4:19 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael D. Nolan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code y (Yes); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 08/29 4:20 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael D. Nolan to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Do not fill out the citizenship of principal parties if Federal Question Basis of Jurisdiction is selected. Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 08/29 4:22 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael D. Nolan to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The actual petition to confirm arbitration must be filed as the main document, not the notice. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/4/2018. (pc) |
||
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 08/20 4:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nolan, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Brief
Mon 08/20 4:54 PM
BRIEF re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration Declaration of Michael D. Nolan in Support of Petitioners' Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 207 . Document filed by EOLICA TRES MESAS 2, S. DE R.L. DE C.V., EOLICA TRES MESAS, S. DE R.L. DE C.V..(Nolan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 137 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 13 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 131 pgs Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
2 | 2
misc
Brief
Mon 08/20 4:50 PM
BRIEF re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration Memorandum of Law in Support of Petitioners' Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Pursuant to U.S.C. § 207 . Document filed by EOLICA TRES MESAS 2, S. DE R.L. DE C.V., EOLICA TRES MESAS, S. DE R.L. DE C.V..(Nolan, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
2
pgs
cmp
Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration
Mon 08/20 4:40 PM
PETITION TO Confirm ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15472982).Document filed by EOLICA TRES MESAS, S. DE R.L. DE C.V., EOLICA TRES MESAS 2, S. DE R.L. DE C.V..(Nolan, Michael) |