New Jersey District Court
Judge:Kevin Mcnulty
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:18-cv-12952
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2018
Re-opened:May 04, 2023
Terminated:May 04, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 13, 2019 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
NABIL ADAM
Represented By
STEVEN BACKFISCH
Lindabury, Mccormick & Estabrook, PC
contact info
Defendant
PERIKLIS PAPAKONSTANTINOU
Represented By
JAMES J. O'HARA
Tompkins, Mcguire, Wachenfeld, & Barry LLP
contact info
Defendant
RUTGERS, THE STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By
MARTIN TREVOR LYONS
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
CAITLIN PETRY CASCINO
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
Represented By
FRANK ROCCO SCHIRRIPA
Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie LLP
contact info
KATHRYN ANNE HETTLER
Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie
contact info
DANIEL B. REHNS
Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie, LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 30 2019
OPINION & ORDER that Defendants Nabil Adam and Periklis Papakonstantinou's Motions to Compel Plaintiff to file an amended complaint using her legal name are Denied. The Clerk shall terminate ECF No. 23 and ECF No. 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/30/2019. (sm)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
113 113 order Stipulation and Order Tue 05/16 1:02 PM
STIPULATION and CONSENT ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Plaintiff Jane Doe, in case number 2:18-cv-12952 dismisses all claims, crossclaims and counterclaims as to all parties with prejudice. Defendants, in case number 2:18-cv-12952, including Adam, dismiss all claims, cross claims and counterclaims with prejudice. Plaintiff Adam, in case number 2:20-cv-05586, dismisses all claims, crossclaims and counterclaims as to all parties with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/16/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
112 112 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Mon 05/15 2:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by RUTGERS, THE STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW JERSEY. (LYONS, MARTIN)
Related: [-]