Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:15-bk-60088

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffrey P Norman
Case #: 6:18-ap-06010
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2018
Terminated:Sep 25, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Prosperity Bank
101 South Main St.
Victoria, TX 77901
Represented By
Prosperity Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael B. Schmidt
401 Grant Place
Corpus Christi, TX 78411
Represented By
Michael B. Schmidt
Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/16 3:21 PM
Adversary Case 6:18-ap-6010 Closed. (rsal)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
36 36 court Courtroom Minutes (CM) Fri 08/23 11:50 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 09:30 AM. Telephonic Appearances: Chris Murray as Trustee and Ronald Simank for Defendant. Related [+]. Status conference held. Mr. Murray provides status report. Status Conference is continued to 9/27/2019 at 11:00 AM at Victoria, 312 S Main. Parties may file agreed motion; if motion is filed, hearing is scheduled for 9/27/2019 at 11:00 AM at Victoria, 312 S Main. (kpico)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/14 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order Setting Hearing
Monday, August 12, 2019
34 34 order Setting Hearing Mon 08/12 3:13 PM
Order resetting Hearing Signed on 8/12/2019 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2019 at 09:30 AM at Victoria, 312 S Main. (mrios)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, July 12, 2019
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/12 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
32 32 order Setting Hearing Wed 07/10 1:21 PM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 7/10/2019 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 8/23/2019 at 12:00 PM at Victoria, 312 S Main. (mrios)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, July 08, 2019
31 31 motion Emergency Motion Mon 07/08 11:39 AM
Emergency Motion to Continue Trial Date in Light of Recent Appointment of Successor Trustee Filed by Trustee Christopher R Murray (Murray, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 22, 2019
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/22 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Scheduling Order
Thursday, June 20, 2019
29 29 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/20 10:18 AM
Order Resetting Trial Signed on 6/20/2019 Related [+] Trial date set for 7/19/2019 at 10:30 AM at Victoria, 312 S Main. (mrios)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 21, 2019
28 28 notice Notice Thu 03/21 1:40 PM
Notice Vacation Notice Regarding Counsel for Defendant . Filed by Prosperity Bank (Simank, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 23, 2019
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/23 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order on Emergency Motion (Adversary)
Thursday, February 21, 2019
26 26 order Emergency (Adversary) Thu 02/21 3:35 PM
Order Approving Emergency Motion to Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel. Related [+] Signed on 2/21/2019. (mrios)
Related: [-] 19
Saturday, February 02, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/02 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion To Substitute Attorney
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/02 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, January 31, 2019
23 23 notice Notice Thu 01/31 4:13 PM
Notice of Hearing and Response Time . Related [+] Filed by Michael B. Schmidt (Schmidt, Michael)
Related: [-] 22 Order Setting Hearing
22 22 order Setting Hearing Thu 01/31 2:32 PM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 1/31/2019 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 2/26/2019 at 12:00 PM at Victoria, 312 S Main. (TraceyConrad)
Related: [-] 19 Emergency Motion To Allow Withdrawal of Counsel
21 21 order Substitute Attorney Thu 01/31 2:27 PM
Order Authorizing Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Related [+] Signed on 1/31/2019. (TraceyConrad)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
20 20 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 01/29 8:40 AM
Agreed Motion To Substitute Attorney. Filed by Prosperity Bank (Simank, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
19 19 motion Emergency Motion Tue 01/08 5:49 PM
Emergency Motion to allow Withdrawal as Counsel and Substitution of other Counsel with Hearing Set for January 29, 2019 at 12:00 in Victoria TX Filed by Michael B. Schmidt (Schmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Approving Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/13 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Comprehensive Scheduling Order
17 17 misc Certificate Wed 12/12 2:05 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Michael B. Schmidt ) Related [+] (Schmidt, Michael)
Related: [-] 16 Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Monday, December 10, 2018
16 16 order Comprehensive Scheduling Order Mon 12/10 2:42 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 12/10/2018 Related [+] Discovery due by 4/12/2019. Trial date set for 7/23/2019 at 09:00 AM at Victoria, 312 S Main. (mrios)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
15 15 court Courtroom Minutes Mon 12/10 12:12 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 12:00. Appearances: Michael Schmidt for the plaintiff, and Jessica Freedson by phone for the defendant. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference held. The Court will enter a Pre-Trial Scheduling Order. Trial date to be set. (TraceyConrad)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, December 07, 2018
14 14 misc Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney) Fri 12/07 11:37 AM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Michael B. Schmidt ). (Schmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
13 13 claims Response Mon 11/19 4:08 PM
Response Related [+]. (Freedson, Jessica)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, October 18, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/18 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Extend Time
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/18 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, October 16, 2018
10 10 order Extend Time Tue 10/16 10:25 AM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Answer to Complaint. Related [+] Signed on 10/16/2018. (mrios)
Related: [-] 8
9 9 order Extend Time Tue 10/16 10:18 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time and Reset Conference Hearing. Related [+] Signed on 10/16/2018. (mrios)
Related: [-] 7
court Hearing Set Tue 10/16 10:21 AM
Hearing Resetting On Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 12:00 PM at Victoria, 312 S Main. (mrios)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, October 12, 2018
8 8 motion Extend Time Fri 10/12 9:34 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Answer to Complaint Filed by Michael B. Schmidt (Schmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint
7 7 motion Extend Time Fri 10/12 9:31 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Joint Report and Reset Conference Hearing on Preliminary Pretrial Order #3 Filed by Michael B. Schmidt (Schmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extending Time to File Joint Report and Reset Conference Hearing
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/11 2:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Prosperity Bank 8/30/2018. (Schmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 25, 2018
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/25 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/25/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 24, 2018
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 08/24 8:39 AM
Summons Issued on Prosperity Bank Date Issued 8/24/2018. (JenniferOlson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
3 3 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/23 8:33 AM
Preliminary Pretrial Order Signed on 8/22/2018 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 12:00 PM at Victoria, 312 S Main. (TraceyConrad)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, August 20, 2018
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Mon 08/20 9:55 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Prosperity Bank. (Schmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 08/20 9:53 AM
Adversary case 18-06010 Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Complaint by Michael B. Schmidt against Prosperity Bank. Fee waived due to lack of funds in the estate. (Schmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]