In re: Google Location History Litigation
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-05062 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 13, 2019 12:43 AM PST |
Defendant
XXVI Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alphabet Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Google, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacy Smedley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Najat Oshana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mahon Nurudaaym
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Kaufman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Jack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fredrick Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Carson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aichi Ali
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Domenic Lombardo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Napoleon Patacsil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
367 | 367
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Settlement
Fri 05/03 6:31 PM
ORDER GRANTING 356 FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL; GRANTING 351 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/3/2024. Compliance Hearing set for 2/13/2025 at 9:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (crr, COURT STAFF) |