Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Sarah S Vance
Referred: Dana Douglas
Case #: 2:18-cv-07939
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2018
Terminated:Apr 24, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Feb 16, 2019 3:35 AM CST
Defendant
Louis J Normand, Jr
801 Oleander Court
Mandeville, LA 70471
Represented By
Frederick L. Bunol
Derbes Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Jared S. Scheinuk
Derbes Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paccar Financial Corp.
Represented By
James Eric Lockridge
Kean Miller (baton Rouge)
contact info
Michael J. O'Brien
Kean Miller Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Truck Capital LLC
Terminated: 11/16/2018
CT Corporation, its Registered Agent 645 Lakeland East Drive Suite 101
Flowood, MS 39232


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
25 25 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Wed 04/24 4:05 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby stayed and administratively closed, reserving the right of any party to file to reopen the matter once the bankruptcy issue is resolved. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 04/24/2019.(am)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 04/24 10:42 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re23 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Filing Bankruptcy. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/23 6:48 PM
NOTICE by Louis J Normand, Jr of Bankruptcy Filing . (Bunol, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Mon 03/25 2:12 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paccar Financial Corp.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/24/2019.(Lockridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration of Linda Markle,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-1 - Summary of Amounts due,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-2 - Demand Letters for Payment from Guarantors,
Att: 6 Exhibit B - Declaration of J. Eric Lockirdge,
Att: 7 Exhibit B-1 - Rule 26 Disclosures from Normand,
Att: 8 Exhibit B-2 - BK Petition for National Truck Funding,
Att: 9 Exhibit B-3 - National Truck-POC#4,
Att: 10 Exhibit B-4 - Post-Confirmation Stipulation,
Att: 11 Notice of Submission
Friday, March 22, 2019
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Fri 03/22 4:26 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paccar Financial Corp.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/24/2019.(Lockridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Material Facts not at Issue,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Linda Markle,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 6 Exhibit B- Declaration of J. Eric Lockridge,
Att: 7 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 8 Exhibit B-2,
Att: 9 Exhibit B-3,
Att: 10 Exhibit B-4
Monday, January 07, 2019
20 20 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 01/07 2:44 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
19 19 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/29 11:28 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Bench Trial (1 to 1.5 days) set for 8/19/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 7/9/2019.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/29/18.(jjs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Friday, November 16, 2018
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 11/16 12:30 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Default Judgment as set forth in document. Signed by the Clerk on 11/16/2018. (am)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Fri 11/16 11:24 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Truck Capital, LLC .**Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
16 16 motion Default Judgment Thu 11/15 11:44 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Default Judgment as to Truck Capital, LLC by Paccar Financial Corp..(O'Brien, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment
Thursday, November 01, 2018
15 15 2 pgs order Order Set Hearings Thu 11/01 1:00 PM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2018 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/1/18.(jjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/25 9:57 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Louis J Normand, Jr.(Bunol, Frederick) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (am)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Thu 09/27 1:37 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Entry of Default as to Truck Capital, LLC. Signed by Clerk of Court on 9/27/18. (jjs)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/27 10:50 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Entry of Default. Normand must file a responsive pleading in this matter by October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/27/2018. (cg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
11 11 motion Entry of Default Wed 09/26 5:11 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Truck Capital, LLC by Paccar Financial Corp..(O'Brien, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Entry of Default,
Att: 3 Summons returned Executed
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/26 5:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; (O'Brien, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/26 1:54 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re6 Summons Returned Executed,8 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,1 Complaint,,, by Louis J Normand, Jr.Attorney Frederick L. Bunol added to party Louis J Normand, Jr(pty:dft).(Bunol, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Tue 09/25 1:10 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Entry of Default as to Louis J. Normand, Jr. a/k/a Louis Normand. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/18. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 24, 2018
7 7 motion Entry of Default Mon 09/24 3:14 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Louis J. Normand, Jr. AKA Louis Normand by Paccar Financial Corp..(O'Brien, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Returned Executed,
Att: 2 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Entry of Default
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/24 3:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louis J Normand, Jr served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (O'Brien, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/06 3:30 PM
**DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Truck Capital LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (O'Brien, Michael) Modified text on 9/6/2018 (am)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
4 4 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 08/21 2:33 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/21 2:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Louis J Normand, Jr, Truck Capital LLC.(am)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 08/21 9:32 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/20 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7069835) filed by Paccar Financial Corp..Attorney James Eric Lockridge added to party Paccar Financial Corp.(pty:clm).(Lockridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Verification of Linda Markle,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21,
Att: 23 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 24 Summons,
Att: 25 Summons,
Att: 26 Summons,
Att: 27 Summons,
Att: 28 Summons