Essex County, New Jersey v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45989 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2018 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 2:18-cv-12313 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:29 PM EST |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Estate of Mortimer Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson
675-G Alpha Drive
Highland Heights, OH 44143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Estate of Raymond Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
CT Corporation System 1300 East Ninth Street
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
ABC Manufacturers
|
|
Defendant
ABC Distributors
|
|
Defendant
ABC Corporations
|
|
Plaintiff
Essex County, New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:29 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) [Transferred from njd on 8/20/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 ENGAGED IN THE DISTRIBUTION OF OPIOIDS, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 ENGAGED IN THE MANUFACTURING OF OPIOIDS, AMERISOURCEBERGEN, CARDINAL HEALTH, CEPHALON, INC., COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, DR. RICHARD SACKLER, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ESTATE OF MORTIMER SACKLER, ESTATE OF RAYMOND SACKLER, INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MALLINCKRODT PLC, MCKESSON, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., RITE AID CORPORATION, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8923806) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ESSEX COUNTY, NEW JERSEY.(CECCHI, JAMES) [Transferred from njd on 8/20/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 ENGAGED IN THE DISTRIBUTION OF OPIOIDS, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 ENGAGED IN THE MANUFACTURING OF OPIOIDS, AMERISOURCEBERGEN, CARDINAL HEALTH, CEPHALON, INC., COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, DR. RICHARD SACKLER, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ESTATE OF MORTIMER SACKLER, ESTATE OF RAYMOND SACKLER, INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MALLINCKRODT PLC, MCKESSON, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., RITE AID CORPORATION, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/20/2018.] | |
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. (CTO 49 MDL 2804 Judge Dan A. Polster.) (gh, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/20/2018.] | |
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 2:18-cv-12313. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |