California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:18-cv-07003
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2018
Terminated:Jul 01, 2020
Last checked: Monday Feb 11, 2019 12:33 AM PST
Petitioner
Gregory Scott Rose
Represented By
Allen-Michel Resnick
Consumer Legal Remedies Apc
contact info
Allen-Michel D Resnick
Consumer Legal Remedies Apc
contact info
Respondent
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Harry Paul Efstratis
Leclairryan LLP
contact info
H Paul Efstratis
Leclairryan LLP
contact info
Kristina Obradovic Lambert
Leclairryan LLP
contact info
Respondent
Zumwalt Ford
Represented By
Harry Paul Efstratis
Leclairryan LLP
contact info
H Paul Efstratis
Leclairryan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
14 14 order Dismissing Case Tue 07/07 3:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR OMNIBUS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE REGARDING CERTAIN CLR PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED HEREIN by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr.: Pursuant to the parties Stipulation, Master MDL Case No. 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx), Dkt. No. 823, the cases identified in this order, including all claims stated herein against all parties, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. See document for further details. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-06998-AB-FFM et al. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
11 11 transfer MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form Wed 08/22 9:31 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) Tue 08/21 4:41 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
7 7 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California. ELECTRONIC TRANSFER SENT. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 08/22 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 mdlcmp Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received Wed 08/22 9:29 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 13 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/13/2018 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:18-cv-797-JAM-AC from USDC Eastern District of California (Sacramento). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFM. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
6 6 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/23/2018 REASSIGNING this case to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. New Case Number: 2:18-cv-00797-JAM-AC. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
Related: [-]
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Order served on Michael D. Resnick NCAED. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
5 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:17-cv-02006-JAM-AC by Ford Motor Company, Zumwalt Ford. Attorney Efstratis, Harry Paul added. (Efstratis, Harry) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
4 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Hunt, G) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
3 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ford Motor Company(Lambert, Kristina) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Interested Entitities
2 2 DECLARATION of H. Paul Efstratis re1 Notice of Removal. (Lambert, Kristina) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2018 00228250 by Ford Motor Co. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7589146)(Lambert, Kristina) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service