Comstock v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45972 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Washington Eastern, 4:18-cv-05119 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:29 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe Corporation 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Entities 1-10
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane 1-10 Does
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
William J Comstock
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Doe Toshani
Terminated: 08/14/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nadia Toshani
Terminated: 08/14/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:31 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-2936607 Filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC.(Adamson, Cheryl) [Transferred from waed on 8/17/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) [Transferred from waed on 8/17/2018.] | ||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 STIPULATION Leave to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC. (Adamson, Cheryl) [Transferred from waed on 8/17/2018.] | |
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Nadia Toshani and John Doe Toshani by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian.(Davis, Brian) [Transferred from waed on 8/17/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Brian G. Davis | ||
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC. (Adamson, Cheryl) [Transferred from waed on 8/17/2018.] | |
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT NADIA TOSHANI AND JOHN DOE TOSHANI; EXTENDING DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) [Transferred from waed on 8/17/2018.] | |
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. File is closed. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (RG, Chief Deputy) [Transferred from waed on 8/17/2018.] | |
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Eastern. Case number 4:18-cv-05119. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |