California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Hannah L Blumenstiel
Case #: 3:18-bk-30924
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Feb 21, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Archer Norris, a Professional Law Corporation
1 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 360
San Francisco, CA 94111-3753
Represented By
Thomas A. Willoughby
Felderstein, Fitzgerald Et Al
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 08/21/2018 5:00 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
crditcrd none Wed 08/22 4:39 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-30924 [misc,volp11] (1717.00). Receipt number 28874699, amount $1717.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Wed 08/22 11:40 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/25/2018 at 10:00 AM at Office of the U.S. Trustee Office 450. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2018. (admin, )
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 08/22 4:37 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1717, Filed by Archer Norris, a Professional Law Corporation. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 08/29/2018. (Willoughby, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 List of 20 Largest Creditors
2 2 misc Creditor Matrix Wed 08/22 4:47 PM
Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Archer Norris, a Professional Law Corporation (Willoughby, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix