BB Liquidating Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Cecelia G Morris |
Case #: | 1:10-bk-14997 |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2010 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 24, 2013 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 26, 2014 |
Converted: | Jul 16, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | Over 100,000 |
Est. Assets | More than $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
BB Liquidating Inc.
2100 Ross Ave Fl 21
Dallas, TX 75201-2739 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants
2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Cred. Comm. Chair
Benderson Development Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Robert L. Geltzer, Trustee for the Estate of BB Liquidating Inc., et al.
Law Offices of Robert L. Geltzer 1556 Third Avenue Suite 505
New York, NY 10128 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Robert L. Geltzer, Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/13/2019 3:14 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 23, 2010 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 10-14997 [misc,824] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7103052. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Judge Burton R. Lifland added to the case. (Cappiello, Karen). | ||
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 10-14997 brl) [motion,122] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7103302. Fee amount 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 10-14997 brl) [motion,122] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7105458. Fee amount 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 10-14997 brl) [motion,122] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7106349. Fee amount 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 10-14997 brl) [motion,122] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7106349. Fee amount 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 10-14997 brl) [motion,122] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7106730. Fee amount 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Martin A. Sosland(This Administrative Entry was entered to reflect accurate event code) filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. Filing fee collected, receipt #184575. (Cantrell, Deirdra) | ||
1 | 1 25 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A due 10/7/2010. Schedule B due 10/7/2010. Schedule C due 10/7/2010. Schedule D due 10/7/2010. Schedule E due 10/7/2010. Schedule F due 10/7/2010. Schedule G due 10/7/2010. Schedule H due 10/7/2010. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/7/2010. Incomplete Filings due by 10/7/2010, Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/21/2011, Disclosure Statement due by 1/21/2011, Initial Case Conference due by 10/25/2010, Filed by Stephen Karotkin of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
2 | 2 Motion for Joint Administration /Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) Requesting Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
3 | 3 Affidavit of Jeffery J. Stegenga Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-2 in Support of First Day Motions filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
4 | 4 5 pgs Statement / Motion Pursuant to Rule 2090-1(b) of the Local Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Martin A. Sosland, Esq. filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) ($25.00 Filing Fee Paid, Receipt Number: 184575) Modified on 9/27/2010 (Porter, Minnie). | |
5 | 5 Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 342(a), and 521(a)(1), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a) and 2002(a), (d), (f), and (l), and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-1 Requesting (I) a Waiver of the Requirement That Debtors File Lists of Creditors and Equity Security Holders and (II) Approval of the Form and Manner of Notifying Creditors of Commencement of Debtors Chapter 11 Cases and First Meeting of Creditors filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
6 | 6 Motion to Extend Time / Debtors' Motion Pursuant 11 U.S.C. § 521 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(c) Requesting an Extension of the Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
7 | 7 Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 345(b), 363(b), 363(c), and 364(a) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6003 and 6004 Requesting (I) Authority to (A) Continue to Operate the Debtors' Cash Management System, (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations on Account of Service Charges Related Thereto, and (C) Maintain Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms; and (II) An Extension of Time to Comply With Section 345(b) of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
8 | 8 Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363(b), and 507 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6003 and 6004 (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Employee Obligations and Maintain and Continue Employee Benefits and Programs and (II) For Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Obligations filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
9 | 9 Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363(b), 507(a)(8), and 541 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6003 and 6004 Requesting Authority to Pay Prepetition Taxes and Assessments filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
10 | 10 (THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN REFILED, SEE DOCUMENT 26 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 362(a)(3) Requesting Approval of (I) Certain Proposed Notification Procedures and (II) Restrictions on Certain Transfers and Conversions of Equity Interests in the Debtors' Estates Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Commencement Date filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) Modified on 9/24/2010 (Richards, Beverly). | |
11 | 11 Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§105(a), 363(b), and 503(b) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4001, 6003, and 6004 for (I) Authority to (A) Continue the Debtors' Insurance Programs and (B) Pay all Obligations in Respect Thereof, and (II) to Direct Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Insurance Obligations filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
12 | 12 Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363 Requesting (I) Authority to Pay Prepetition Claims of Common Carriers, and (II) Direction of Banks and Other Financial Institutions to Honor Related Checks and Electronic Payment Requests filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
13 | 13 Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 503(b)(1) for Authorization to Honor Certain Prepetition Customer Programs filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
14 | 14 Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363(b), and 503(b) Requesting Authority to Honor Certain Undisputed Prepetition Obligations of Certain Essential Vendors, Suppliers, and Service Providers filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
15 | 15 Motion to Authorize /Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363(b)(1), and 503(b) and Fed R. Bankr. P. 6003 and 6004 Requesting (I) Authority to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Movie Studios and Game Providers and (II) Administrative Expense Priority Status for All Undisputed Obligations Arising Postpetition filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
16 | 16 Motion to Approve Debtor in Possession Financing / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, on an Interim and Final Basis, (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Superpriority Financing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 364(c), 364(d)(1), and 364(e), (II) Authorizing Debtors' Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363, (III) Granting Liens and Superpriority Claims to DIP Lenders Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 364, (IV) Providing Adequate Protection Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 361, 362, 363 and 364, and (V) Scheduling a Final Hearing Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 2002, 4001(b), 4001 (c), and 6004 filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
17 | 17 Notice of Appearance filed by David L. Pollack on behalf of Centro Properties Group, Federal Realty Investment Trust. (Pollack, David) | |
18 | 18 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by David L. Pollack on behalf of Centro Properties Group, Federal Realty Investment Trust. (Pollack, David) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Banda Calvo on behalf of Richardson ISD. (Banda Calvo, Elizabeth) | |
20 | 20 Notice of Hearing /Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Cases and First Day Hearing scheduled for September 23, 2010 at 11:30 am (Eastern Time) filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/23/2010 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
21 | 21 Application to Employ Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC as Notice and Claims Agent filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
22 | 22 Application to Employ Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
23 | 23 Application to Employ Rothschild Inc. as Financial Advisor and Investment Banker filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
24 | 24 Motion to Authorize /Application of the Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363(b) to (I) Retain Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC to Provide the Debtors a Chief Restructuring Officer and Certain Additional Personnel and (II) Designate Jeffrey J. Stegenga as Chief Restructuring Officer for the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Commencement Date filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
25 | 25 Notice of Hearing / Agenda for September 23, 2010 "First Day" Hearing filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
26 | 26 Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 362(a)(3) Requesting Approval of (I) Certain Proposed Notification Procedures and (II) Restrictions on Certain Transfers and Conversions of Equity Interests in the Debtors' Estates Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Commencement Date filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
27 | 27 Affidavit of Service re Various First Day Pleadings filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) | |
28 | 28 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen A. Goodwin on behalf of Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC. (Goodwin, Stephen) | |
29 | 29 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Ronald M. Tucker on behalf of Simon Property Group, Inc.. (Tucker, Ronald) | |
30 | 30 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by James S. Carr on behalf of Weingarten Realty Investors, Regency Centers Corporation, Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Developers Diversified Realty Corporation, Basser-Kaufman, Aston Properties. (Carr, James) | |
31 | 31 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Weller on behalf of Dallas County. (Weller, Elizabeth) | |
32 | 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Frank McGinn on behalf of Iron Mountain Information Management, Inc..(McGinn, Frank) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
33 | 33 Notice of Appearance filed by Yolanda M. Humphrey on behalf of Fort Bend Independent School District. (Humphrey, Yolanda) | |
34 | 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Owen M. Sonik on behalf of Spring Branch Independent School District. (Sonik, Owen) | |
35 | 35 Notice of Appearance Request for Special Notice filed by Dustin Parker Branch on behalf of West Valley Properties, Inc., RREEF Management Company, The Macerich Company. (Branch, Dustin) | |
36 | 36 5 pgs Order signed on 9/23/2010 Granting Motion Directing the Procedural Consolidation and Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of Blockbuster Digital Technologies Inc.; Blockbuster Inc.; Blockbuster Canada Inc.; Blockbuster Distribution, Inc.; Blockbuster Gift Card, Inc.; Blockbuster Global Services Inc.; Blockbuster International Spain Inc.; Blockbuster Investments LLC; Blockbuster Procurement LP; Blockbuster Video Italy, Inc; Movielink, LLC; Trading Zone Inc.; and B2 LLC. The docket in Case No. 10 14997 (BRL) Should be Consulted for all Matters Affecting This Case . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
37 | 37 Order signed on 9/23/2010 (I) Waiving Requirement To File Lists of Creditors and Equity Security Holders and (II) Approving Form and Manner of Notifying Creditors of Commencement of Debtors Chapter 11 Cases and First Meeting of Creditors . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
38 | 38 Order signed on 9/23/2010 Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
39 | 39 Order signed on 9/23/2010 Authorizing Debtors to Honor Certain Prepetition Customer Programs . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
40 | 40 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Pleadings filed by John P. Dillman on behalf of Montgomery County, Galveston County, Harris County, Liberty County, Texas City ISD, Cypress Fairbanks ISD, Orange County, Fort Bend County, Katy ISD. (Dillman, John) | |
41 | 41 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by David J. McCarty on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee and Collateral Agent. (McCarty, David) | |
42 | 42 Interim Order signed on 9/23/2010 (I) Establishing Notification Procedures, and(II) Approving Restrictions on Certain Transfers and Conversions of Equity Interests in The Debtors Estates Effective Nunc Pro Tunc To The Commencement Date. If objections filed, Hearing to be held on 10/19/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
43 | 43 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Kyle Mathews on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee and Collateral Agent. (Mathews, Kyle) | |
44 | 44 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Kyle Mathews on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee and Collateral Agent. (Mathews, Kyle) | |
45 | 45 Affidavit / Verified Statement of U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee and Collateral Agent, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2010 filed by Kyle Mathews on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee and Collateral Agent. (Mathews, Kyle) | |
46 | 46 Interim Order signed on 9/23/2010 (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Employee Obligations and Maintain and Continue Employee Benefits and Programs and (II) Directing Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Obligations . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
47 | 47 Order signed on 9/23/2010 Approving the Retention of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC as Notice and Claims Agent for the Debtor . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
48 | 48 Order signed on 9/23/2010 Scheduling Initial Case Conference . With hearing to be held on 10/19/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
49 | 49 Notice of Appearance filed by George Rosenberg on behalf of Treasurer of Arapahoe County, Colorado. (Rosenberg, George) | |
50 | 50 Interim Order signed on 9/23/2010 (I) Authorizing The Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Common Carriers and Other Lien Claimants, and (II) Directing Banks and Other Financial Institutions to Honor Related Checks And Electronic Payment Requests. With Final Hearing to be held on 10/19/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
51 | 51 Interim Order signed on 9/23/2010 Granting (I) Authority To (A) Continue To Operate The Debtors Cash Management System, (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations On Account of Service Charges Related Thereto, and (C) Maintain Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms and (II) An Extension of Time To Comply With 11 U.S.C. Section 345(b). With Final Hearing to be held on 10/19/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
52 | 52 Interim Order signed on 9/23/2010 (I) Authorizing Debtors to (A) Continue Their Insurance Programs and (B) Pay All Obligations in Respect Thereof, and (II) Directing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related To Such Insurance Obligations. With Final Hearing to be held on 10/19/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) | |
53 | 53 Notice of Hearing / Notice of Continuation of "First Day" Hearing filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/27/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Karotkin, Stephen) | |
54 | 54 Notice of Appearance Request for Special Notice filed by Nancy Hotchkiss on behalf of Potter-Taylor & Company. (Hotchkiss, Nancy) | |
55 | 55 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Pamela K. Webster on behalf of Sony Pictures Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Webster, Pamela) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order |