National Education Association et al v. DeVos et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05173 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 19, 2019 12:50 AM PST |
Defendant
Betsy DeVos
in her official capacity as Secretary of Education, and 400 Maryland Ave. SW
Washington, DC 20202 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Teachers Association
1705 Murchison Drive
Burlingame, CA 94010 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shane Heiman
748 New York St.
Lawrence, KS 66044 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Education Association
1201 16th Street NW
Washington, DC 94010 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Portilla
786 McDonald Way
Greenfield, CA 93927 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kwynn Uyehara
40812 Blacow Rd.
Fremont, CA 94538 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
54 | 54
1
pgs
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 08/14 12:37 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to52 Notice of Appeal filed by Betsy DeVos, United States Department of Education (fabS, COURT STAFF) |