Caruso v. Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50251 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 18, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc.
696 Catherine St.
Atlanta, GA 30310 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Tue 06/25 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 291815. (TW) |
||
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 06/18 3:56 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50251] Closed. (lak) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Tue 06/04 3:09 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Harley K Means, Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc., Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 04/17 12:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 04/17/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (306960)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 03/14 10:48 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 03/13/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (305722)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/13 2:12 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/13/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (304385)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 01/16 3:21 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/16/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (303003)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 12/13 2:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 12/12/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (301695)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 11/15 8:27 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 11/14/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (299880)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Appearance
Fri 10/19 10:44 AM
Appearance filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc. (Means, Harley) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc.
Fri 10/05 11:41 AM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 11/14/2018 at 01:30 PM EST via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 10/02 2:59 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc. (Means, Harley) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 09/25 9:41 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint . Deficiency to be cured by 10/9/2018. (lak) |
|
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 09/25 9:36 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 10/9/2018. (lak) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/24 5:02 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc . (Means, Harley) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Mon 09/24 5:00 PM
Appearance filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc. (Means, Harley) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Thu 08/30 4:02 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc . (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Fri 08/24 8:09 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 09/07/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 9/24/2018. (lak) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Thu 08/23 1:42 PM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/23 1:41 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50251 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) Atlanta's Favorite Transportation, Inc. (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Theisen, Meredith) |