California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:18-cr-03373
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Aug 25, 2018 12:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Miguel Alejandro Flores (1)
Represented By
Serena Premjee
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Eric George Roscoe
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Mar 27 2019
JUDGMENT as to Miguel Alejandro Flores (1), Count(s) 1, 2, Custody BOP for a term of 12 months and 1 day as to each count to run concurrently. 3 years Supervised Release as to each count to run concurrently. $100.00 Assessment as to each count ($200.00 total). No fine. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello (rmc)

Docket last updated: 08/25/2018 12:56 AM PDT
Thursday, June 28, 2018
Arrest of Miguel Alejandro Flores 06/28/18 (no document attached) (tar) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Miguel Alejandro Flores. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 6/29/2018 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/12/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. Arraignment set for 7/26/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis.(tar) (sjt). [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 info sheet
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis: Initial Appearance as to Miguel Alejandro Flores held on 6/29/2018. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Miguel Alejandro Flores. Government oral motion for detention due to risk of flight. No bail. Defense oral motion for leg restraints to be removed denied. without prejudice. Preliminary Hearing set for 07/12/18 at 1:30 pm. Arraignment set for 07/26/18 at 1:30 pm. Detention Hearing - RF set for 7/3/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (CD# 6/29/2018 PCL:01-2:20-2:29). (Plaintiff Attorney Kaitlin Tracey). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson). (tar) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION to Detain by USA as to Miguel Alejandro Flores. (no document attached) (tar) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Miguel Alejandro Flores (no document attached) (tar) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Miguel Alejandro Flores (mpl) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Serena Premjee appearing for Miguel Alejandro Flores (Premjee, Serena)Attorney Serena Premjee added to party Miguel Alejandro Flores(pty:dft) (lrc). [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Miguel Alejandro Flores(Premjee, Serena) (lrc). [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis: Detention Hearing as to Miguel Alejandro Flores held on 7/3/2018. Gov't Motion to Detain (ECF No.3) is denied. Bond set as to Miguel Alejandro Flores (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 1 FRA plus 10 percent cash deposit. (CD# 7/3/2018 PCL 18:3:17-3:34). (Plaintiff Attorney Kaitlin Tracey, S/A AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Hootan Baigmohammadi, FD). (no document attached) (nbp) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Miguel Alejandro Flores (1) $20,000 P/S.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/03/2018. (ADI, jao) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Eric George Roscoe appearing for USA. (Roscoe, Eric)Attorney Eric George Roscoe added to party USA(pty:pla) (lrc). [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
12 12 P/S Bond Filed as to Miguel Alejandro Flores in amount of $ $20,000 secured by 1 FRA plus 10 percent cash deposit, Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (Document applicable to USA, Miguel Alejandro Flores.) (tcf) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
11 11 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Miguel Alejandro Flores. (sjm) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis: Preliminary Hearing Continued as to Miguel Alejandro Flores. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 7/26/2018 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (CD# 7/12/2018 PCL 18:2:45-2:50). (Plaintiff Attorney Kaitlin Tracey, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson, FD S/A). (mxn) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
14 14 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Miguel Alejandro Flores. Arraignment set for 7/26/2018 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (no document attached) (ccc) [2:18-mj-09300-PCL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
15 15 INFORMATION as to Miguel Alejandro Flores (1) count(s) 1, 2. (rmc) (dsn)
Related: [-]
16 16 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Miguel Alejandro Flores (rmc) (dsn)
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Arraignment as to Miguel Alejandro Flores (1) on Counts 1 and 2 of the Information held on 7/26/2018. Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 8/27/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Michael M. Anello. The defendant may remain in El Centro and schedule a plea before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. Alternatively, counsel is directed to contact the clerk for Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal if a Change of Plea Hearing needs to be scheduled in San Diego.(CD# 7/26/2018 JLB 18:1:40-1:50). (Plaintiff Attorney Kaitlin Tracey, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney James A. Johnson, FD). (yeb)
Related: [-]