Member Case
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-43168

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:18-bk-43290
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2018
Dismissed:May 25, 2023
Terminated:Jun 09, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CM Resort Management LLC
75001 IH-20
Gordon, TX 76453
Represented By
Gerrit M. Pronske
Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Friday, June 09, 2023
court Close bankruptcy case Fri 06/09 8:57 AM
Bankruptcy case closed. (Nunns, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 27, 2023
36 36 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 05/27 11:19 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 33. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 5/25/2023
Thursday, May 25, 2023
35 35 order Dismiss case Thu 05/25 1:49 PM
Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 5/25/2023 (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
34 34 5 pgs order Order (generic) Tue 05/23 3:00 PM
Order Terminating Joint Administration of Case. Entered on 5/23/2023 (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
33 33 misc Withdrawal Wed 04/26 2:37 PM
Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to dismiss case
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
32 32 court Hearing held Thu 10/13 2:37 PM
Hearing held on 10/12/2022. Related [+] ***CONTINUED TO DATE TBD*** (Almaraz, Jeanette)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Monday, October 10, 2022
31 31 answer Objection Mon 10/10 2:01 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor MAR Living Trust. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to dismiss case filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer
Monday, September 19, 2022
30 30 misc Certificate of service Mon 09/19 11:51 AM
Certificate of service re: Motion to Dismiss and Notice of Hearing filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to dismiss case ,29 Notice of hearing
29 29 notice Notice of hearing Mon 09/19 11:49 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 10/12/2022 at 01:30 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm. for28 , (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
28 28 motion Dismiss case Mon 09/19 11:18 AM
Motion to dismiss case Filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 15, 2018
27 27 order Joint administration Thu 11/15 10:27 AM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:18-bk-43168 with member case 4:2018-bk-43290-mxm Related [+]Judge Russell F. Nelms assigned. Involvement of Judge Mark X. Mullin terminated Entered on 11/15/2018. (McCrory, J.)
Related: [-] 18
26 26 order Employ Thu 11/15 10:19 AM
Order granting application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. for CM Resort Management LLC as Attorney Related [+] Entered on 11/15/2018. (McCrory, J.)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, November 02, 2018
court Meeting of creditors held Fri 11/02 2:00 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 11/2/2018 Related [+] (Schmidt, Erin)
Related: [-] Meeting of creditors continued/adjourned
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
25 25 motion Appoint trustee Tue 10/30 4:42 PM
Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
24 24 answer Objection Mon 10/29 4:49 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43294 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43561 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC
Friday, October 19, 2018
23 23 answer Objection Fri 10/19 4:07 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-] 14 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC
22 22 answer Objection Fri 10/19 12:32 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-] 14 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC
trustee Meeting of creditors continued/adjourned Fri 10/19 9:41 AM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/2/2018 at 09:30 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. (Young, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
21 21 misc Statement of financial affairs Fri 10/12 4:57 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC Related [+]. (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
20 20 35 pgs misc Schedules Fri 10/12 4:56 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC Related [+]. (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
19 19 notice Notice of hearing Tue 10/09 3:38 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 10/31/2018 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm. for18 and for14 , (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-] 14 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Pronske # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Creditor Matrix),18 Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43294 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43561 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service Lists)
Att: 1 Service List
Thursday, October 04, 2018
18 18 motion Joint administration Thu 10/04 11:43 AM
Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43294 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43561 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service Lists
Friday, September 28, 2018
17 17 order Extend/Shorten time Fri 09/28 7:25 AM
Order granting12 Motion to extend time. Related [+] Schedule A/B due 10/12/2018 for3 , Schedule D due 10/12/2018 for3 , Schedule E/F due 10/12/2018 for3 , Schedule G due 10/12/2018 for3 , Schedule H due 10/12/2018 for3 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/12/2018 for3 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 10/12/2018 for3 , Entered on 9/28/2018. (McCrory, J.)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Notice of deficiency
Thursday, September 27, 2018
16 16 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 09/27 2:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Randal Gilbert Mathis filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Mathis, Randal)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 09/27 9:57 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for debtor. Related [+] Responses due by 10/7/2018. (Whitaker, Sherri)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix (RE: related document(s)3 Notice of deficiency) Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Creditor Matrix)
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
14 14 motion Employ Tue 09/25 3:10 PM
Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Pronske
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Creditor Matrix
Monday, September 17, 2018
13 13 misc Certificate of service Mon 09/17 4:05 PM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Monday, September 10, 2018
12 12 motion Extend/Shorten time Mon 09/10 5:27 PM
Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Related [+] Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Creditor Matrix
Thursday, September 06, 2018
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Thu 09/06 11:47 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/06/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/19/2018 at 09:30 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 1/17/2019. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 10/1/2018.
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
10 10 misc 20 Largest unsecured creditors Tue 09/04 3:32 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
9 9 misc Matrix Tue 09/04 3:31 PM
Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor CM Resort Management LLC Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
Thursday, August 30, 2018
8 8 court BNC certificate of mailing Thu 08/30 11:31 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 9/10/2018. Schedule D due 9/10/2018. Schedule E/F due 9/10/2018. Schedule G due 9/10/2018. Schedule H due 9/10/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 9/10/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/10/2018. Creditor matrix due 8/30/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 8/29/2018.
7 7 court BNC certificate of mailing Thu 08/30 11:31 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 INCORRECT ENTRY: SEE DOC. #3 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 9/10/2018. Schedule D due 9/10/2018. Schedule E/F due 9/10/2018. Schedule G due 9/10/2018. Schedule H due 9/10/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 9/10/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/10/2018. Creditor matrix due 8/30/2018. (Whitaker, Sherri) MODIFIED on 8/28/2018 .
6 6 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Thu 08/30 3:08 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/19/2018 at 09:30 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 1/17/2019. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 10/1/2018. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
5 5 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 08/29 1:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of DENNIS OLSON by Dennis Oliver Olson filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 08/29 12:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by RANDAL MATHIS, MARK DONHEISER, and ANH V. TRAN by Dennis Oliver Olson filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
3 3 court Notice of deficiency Tue 08/28 8:18 AM
Amended Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 9/10/2018. Schedule D due 9/10/2018. Schedule E/F due 9/10/2018. Schedule G due 9/10/2018. Schedule H due 9/10/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 9/10/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/10/2018. Creditor matrix due 8/30/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 8/29/2018. (Whitaker, Sherri)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of deficiency Tue 08/28 8:07 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 9/10/2018. Schedule D due 9/10/2018. Schedule E/F due 9/10/2018. Schedule G due 9/10/2018. Schedule H due 9/10/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 9/10/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/10/2018. Creditor matrix due 8/30/2018. (Whitaker, Sherri)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 08/28 5:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 18-43290 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 25585861, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, August 27, 2018
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Mon 08/27 1:44 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by CM Resort Management LLC (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-]