Member Case
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-43168

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:18-bk-43294
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2018
Dismissed:May 23, 2023
Terminated:Jun 07, 2023

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Destination Development Community III, Ltd.
75001 IH-20
Gordon, TX 76453
Represented By
Gerrit M. Pronske
Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
court Close bankruptcy case Wed 06/07 10:00 AM
Bankruptcy case closed. (Rueter, Karyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
33 33 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 05/25 11:19 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 35. Notice Date 05/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 5/23/2023
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
32 32 order Dismiss case Tue 05/23 1:42 PM
Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 5/23/2023 (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-]
31 31 5 pgs order Order (generic) Tue 05/23 1:41 PM
Order terminating joint administration of dismissal debtor cases, and dismissing dismissal debtor cases. Entered on 5/23/2023 (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
30 30 misc Withdrawal Wed 04/26 2:38 PM
Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to dismiss case
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
29 29 court Hearing held Thu 10/13 2:40 PM
Hearing held on 10/12/2022. Related [+] ***CONTINUED TO DATE TBD*** (Almaraz, Jeanette)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Monday, October 10, 2022
28 28 answer Objection Mon 10/10 2:04 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor MAR Living Trust. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to dismiss case filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer
Monday, September 19, 2022
27 27 misc Certificate of service Mon 09/19 12:00 PM
Certificate of service re: Motion to Dismiss and Notice of Hearing filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to dismiss case ,26 Notice of hearing
26 26 notice Notice of hearing Mon 09/19 11:58 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 10/12/2022 at 01:30 PM Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm. for25 , (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to dismiss case Filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
25 25 motion Dismiss case Mon 09/19 11:56 AM
Motion to dismiss case Filed by Trustee John Dee Spicer (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 15, 2018
24 24 order Employ Thu 11/15 5:02 PM
Order granting application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. for Destination Development Community III, Ltd. as Attorney Related [+] Entered on 11/15/2018. (Ward, J)
Related: [-] 12
23 23 order Joint administration Thu 11/15 4:46 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:18-bk-43168 with member case 4:2018-bk-43294-mxm Related [+]. An order has been entered in this case directing joint administration of thiscase solely for procedural purposes with the Chapter 11 bankruptcy case ofCM Resort, LLC, Case No. 18-43168 rfn11. The CM Resort, LLC docketshould be consulted on all matters affecting this case. Judge Russell F. Nelms assigned. Involvement of Judge Mark X. Mullin terminated. Entered on 11/15/2018. (Ward, J)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, November 02, 2018
court Meeting of creditors held Fri 11/02 2:00 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 11/2/2018 Related [+] (Schmidt, Erin)
Related: [-] Meeting of creditors continued/adjourned
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
22 22 motion Appoint trustee Tue 10/30 4:44 PM
Motion to appoint trustee Filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
21 21 answer Objection Mon 10/29 4:50 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43290 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43561 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd.
Friday, October 19, 2018
20 20 answer Objection Fri 10/19 4:02 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-] 12 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd.
19 19 answer Objection Fri 10/19 12:38 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-] 12 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd.
trustee Meeting of creditors continued/adjourned Fri 10/19 9:42 AM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/2/2018 at 09:30 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. (Young, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
18 18 misc Statement of financial affairs Fri 10/12 5:04 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. Related [+]. (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
17 17 misc Schedules Fri 10/12 5:04 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. Related [+]. (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
16 16 notice Notice of hearing Tue 10/09 3:40 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 10/31/2018 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm. for12 and for15 , (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-] 12 Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Pronske # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Creditor Matrix),15 Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43290 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43561 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 Filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service Lists)
Att: 1 Service List
Thursday, October 04, 2018
15 15 motion Joint administration Thu 10/04 11:45 AM
Motion for joint administration of cases 18-43168 rfn11; 18-43290 mxm11; 18-43292 rfn11; 18-43561 rfn11; 18-43562 mxm11; 18-43563 rfn11; 18-43565 mxm11; 18-43566 mxm11; 18-43567 rfn11 Filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Service Lists
Thursday, September 27, 2018
14 14 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 09/27 2:36 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Randal Gilbert Mathis filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Mathis, Randal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
13 13 order Extend/Shorten time Wed 09/26 9:35 AM
Order granting10 Motion to extend time. Related [+] Schedule A/B due 10/12/2018 for2 , Schedule D due 10/12/2018 for2 , Schedule E/F due 10/12/2018 for2 , Schedule G due 10/12/2018 for2 , Schedule H due 10/12/2018 for2 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/12/2018 for2 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 10/12/2018 for2 , Entered on 9/26/2018. (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)
Related: [-] related document(s)2 Notice of deficiency
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
12 12 motion Employ Tue 09/25 3:20 PM
Application to employ Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, P.C. as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. (Goolsby, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Pronske
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Creditor Matrix
Monday, September 17, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of service Mon 09/17 4:12 PM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Monday, September 10, 2018
10 10 motion Extend/Shorten time Mon 09/10 5:22 PM
Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Related [+] Filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Creditor Matrix
Sunday, September 02, 2018
9 9 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sun 09/02 11:33 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/02/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/19/2018 at 09:30 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 1/17/2019. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 10/1/2018.
Thursday, August 30, 2018
8 8 court BNC certificate of mailing Thu 08/30 11:31 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 9/10/2018. Schedule D due 9/10/2018. Schedule E/F due 9/10/2018. Schedule G due 9/10/2018. Schedule H due 9/10/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 9/10/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/10/2018. Creditor matrix due 8/30/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 8/29/2018.
7 7 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Thu 08/30 3:10 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/19/2018 at 09:30 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 1/17/2019. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 10/1/2018. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
6 6 misc 20 Largest unsecured creditors Wed 08/29 4:51 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
5 5 misc Matrix Wed 08/29 4:50 PM
Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Destination Development Community III, Ltd. Related [+]. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
4 4 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 08/29 1:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of RANDAL MATHIS, MARK DONHEISER, and ANH V. TRAN by Dennis Oliver Olson filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 08/29 12:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Dennis Oliver Olson filed by Creditor Suzann Ruff. (Olson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
2 2 court Notice of deficiency Tue 08/28 2:51 PM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 9/10/2018. Schedule D due 9/10/2018. Schedule E/F due 9/10/2018. Schedule G due 9/10/2018. Schedule H due 9/10/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 9/10/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/10/2018. Creditor matrix due 8/30/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 8/29/2018. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 08/28 5:08 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 18-43294 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 25585914, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, August 27, 2018
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Mon 08/27 1:51 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Destination Development Community III, Ltd. (Pronske, Gerrit)
Related: [-]