California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:18-cv-01834
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2018
Terminated:Dec 12, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Feb 24, 2019 1:45 AM PST
Defendant
Nerium International, LLC
Represented By
Harrison Maxwell Brown
Blank Rome
contact info
Ping Zhang
Blank Rome
contact info
Mike Margolis
Blank Rome
contact info
Anahit Tagvoryan
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant
Jeff Olson
Represented By
Harrison Maxwell Brown
Blank Rome
contact info
Ping Zhang
Blank Rome
contact info
Mike Margolis
Blank Rome
contact info
Anahit Tagvoryan
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Kimberly Gerdo
Represented By
James G Bohm
Bohm Wildish And Matsen LLP
contact info
Christopher J Green
Bohm Wildish And Matsen LLP
contact info
Klaus Heinze
Bohm Wildish And Matsen LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
41 41 order Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 12/13 2:06 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss22 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See Minute Order for specifics. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
40 40 misc Objection Mon 11/19 8:40 PM
OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related),,35 filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson.(Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Evidentiary Objections of Defendants Nerium International, LLC and Jeff Olson to Declaration of Kimberly Gerdo Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Oppositions
39 39 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 11/19 8:36 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) 25 filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 11/19 8:34 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending the Outcome of Arbitration 24 filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 11/19 8:32 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) 23 filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 11/19 8:30 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) 22 filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 12, 2018
35 35 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 11/12 5:26 PM
DECLARATION of Kimberly Gerdo in support of plaintiff's oppositions to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) 23 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) 22 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending the Outcome of Arbitration 24 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) 25 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo. (Bohm, James)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 11/12 5:24 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher Green in support of plaintiff's oppositions to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) 23 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) 22 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending the Outcome of Arbitration 24 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) 25 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo.(Bohm, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
33 33 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 11/12 5:20 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) 23 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo. (Bohm, James)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 11/12 5:19 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending the Outcome of Arbitration 24 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo. (Bohm, James)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 11/12 5:18 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) 25 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo. (Bohm, James)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 11/12 5:15 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) 22 filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo. (Bohm, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
29 29 order Continue Fri 11/09 11:07 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer on Stipulation to Continue hearing on Defendants' Pending Motions and to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines28 (See Order for Specifics). (rfi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
28 28 motion Continue Thu 11/08 3:55 PM
REQUEST to Continue Pending Motions and Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Gerdo. (Green, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
27 27 order Extension of Time to File Fri 11/02 9:13 AM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION26 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 10/26 2:38 PM
APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File A Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Gerdo. (Bohm, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Decl of C. Green,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, October 04, 2018
25 25 motion Dismiss Case Thu 10/04 8:10 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Zhang, Ping)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
24 24 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Thu 10/04 8:01 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending the Outcome of Arbitration filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Zhang, Ping)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
23 23 motion Transfer Case Thu 10/04 7:52 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Zhang, Ping)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
22 22 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 10/04 7:40 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Zhang, Ping)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
21 21 misc Declaration Thu 10/04 5:38 PM
DECLARATION of Harrison Brown in support of concurrently filed motions filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. (Tagvoryan, Anahit)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Declaration Thu 10/04 5:37 PM
DECLARATION of Kayla Wagner in support of concurrently filed motions filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. (Tagvoryan, Anahit)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Declaration Thu 10/04 5:35 PM
DECLARATION of Jeff Olson in support of concurrently filed motions filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. (Tagvoryan, Anahit)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
18 18 misc Errata Wed 09/26 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. correcting Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (Zhang, Ping)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
17 17 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 09/04 12:41 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeff Olson answer now due 10/4/2018; Nerium International, LLC answer now due 10/4/2018, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Jeff Olson; Nerium International, LLC.(Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Harrison Brown,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 30, 2018
16 16 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 08/30 12:13 PM
Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Trial Estimate: 3 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 08/30 12:02 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 08/30 8:52 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
13 13 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 08/29 5:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 8/28/18. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 08/29 5:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 8/28/18. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 08/29 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other)4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Joinder in Complaint. (ghap)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 08/29 3:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Wed 08/29 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dale S. Fischer. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:18-cv-1834 DSF (SHKx). (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 08/28 2:47 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Harrison Maxwell Brown counsel for Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. Adding Ping Zhang as counsel of record for Nerium International, LLC and Jeff Olson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC and Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 08/28 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Harrison Maxwell Brown counsel for Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. Adding Ana Tagvoryan as counsel of record for Nerium International, LLC and Jeff Olson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC and Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 08/28 2:43 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Harrison Maxwell Brown counsel for Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. Adding Mike Margolis as counsel of record for Nerium International, LLC and Jeff Olson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC and Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 08/28 2:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Harrison Maxwell Brown counsel for Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. Adding Harrison Brown as counsel of record for Nerium International, LLC and Jeff Olson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC and Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/28 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 08/28 2:22 PM
Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson, (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 08/28 2:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. (Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 08/28 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC1814331 Receipt No: 0973-22329745 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Jeff Olson, Nerium International, LLC. (Attorney Harrison Maxwell Brown added to party Nerium International, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Harrison Maxwell Brown added to party Jeff Olson(pty:dft))(Brown, Harrison)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 08/29 3:40 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Nerium International, LLC, Jeff Olson. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/13/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE TO REMOVAL) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 08/29 3:43 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo, upon Defendant Jeff Olson served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Haynes, Esq., Corporate Counsel in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/26/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 08/29 3:45 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo, upon Defendant Nerium International, LLC served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laura Perez, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/26/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 08/29 3:48 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kimberly Gerdo, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Haynes, Esq., Corporate Counsel, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/31/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap)
Related: [-]