FREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. GOOGLE INC. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Trevor N Mcfadden |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02030 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 25, 2019 4:32 AM EST |
Defendant
APPLE INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FACEBOOK INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GOOGLE INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TWITTER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FREEDOM WATCH, INC.
individually and on behalf of those similarly situated 2020 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Suite 345
Washington, DC 20006 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LAURA LOOMER
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 14 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION re Defendants' 29 Joint Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/14/2019. (lctnm3) |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
49 | 49
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 08/13 1:10 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to46 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by LAURA LOOMER, FREEDOM WATCH, INC. ; USCA Case Number 19-7030 (zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Search & Seizure Warrant | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Thu 07/18 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FACEBOOK INC.. Attorney Mary Elizabeth Miller terminated. (Miller, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 04/18 5:36 PM
USCA Case Number 19-7030 for46 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by LAURA LOOMER, FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 04/16 10:03 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re46 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (tth) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Mon 04/15 6:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to45 Order, by FREEDOM WATCH, INC., LAURA LOOMER. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-6061145. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Klayman, Larry) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
order
.Order
Thu 03/14 4:20 PM
ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants'29 Motion to Dismiss, for the reasons set forth in the accompanying44 Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. This is a final, appealable Order. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/14/2019. (lctnm3) |
|
44 | 44
15
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Thu 03/14 4:16 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re Defendants'29 Joint Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/14/2019. (lctnm3) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Thu 02/28 3:01 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to APPLE INC.. Attorney Michael J. Gottlieb terminated. (Gottlieb, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Wed 02/27 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GOOGLE INC. (Schmidtlein, John) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 02/25 7:46 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re29 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by APPLE INC., FACEBOOK INC., GOOGLE INC., TWITTER, INC.. (Willen, Brian) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/25 7:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Adam Kraehenbuehl on behalf of APPLE INC. (Kraehenbuehl, James) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/25 7:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Riley on behalf of APPLE INC. (Riley, Joshua) |
|
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/25 7:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Isaacson on behalf of APPLE INC. (Isaacson, William) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Tue 02/12 6:38 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to APPLE INC.. Attorney James Adam Kraehenbuehl terminated. (Kraehenbuehl, James) |
|
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Tue 02/12 6:29 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to APPLE INC.. Attorney William A. Isaacson terminated. (Isaacson, William) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 02/12 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael J. Gottlieb (Gottlieb, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response to motion
Mon 02/11 11:35 PM
RESPONSE re29 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC., LAURA LOOMER. (Klayman, Larry) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 02/11 4:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Two Days by FREEDOM WATCH, INC., LAURA LOOMER (Klayman, Larry) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 02/11 4:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiffs'33 Third Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/11/19. (lctnm1) |
||
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 02/06 9:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting in part the Plaintiffs'32 Second Motion for Extension of Time. This is the second time that the Plaintiffs have failed to follow the Court's2 Standing Order's provisions on motions for extensions of time. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants'29 Motion to Dismiss on or before February 11, 2019. Defendants may reply to any opposition on or before February 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/6/19. (lctnm1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 02/06 1:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due by 2/11/2019. Defendants' reply to any opposition due by 2/25/2019. (hmc) |
||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 02/05 6:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by FREEDOM WATCH, INC., LAURA LOOMER (Klayman, Larry) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Wed 01/30 5:33 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GOOGLE INC.. Attorney Kannon K. Shanmugam terminated. (Schmidtlein, John) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 01/08 1:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting the Plaintiffs'30 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants'29 Motion to Dismiss on or before February 6, 2019. Defendants may reply to any opposition on or before February 20, 2019. The parties are reminded to strictly comply with the Court's2 Standing Order, including the provisions governing motions for extensions of time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/8/19. (lctnm1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 01/08 1:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Dispositive Motion due by 2/6/2019; Defendants' Reply due by 2/20/2019. (tg) |
||
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 01/07 6:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by FREEDOM WATCH, INC., LAURA LOOMER (Klayman, Larry) |
|
Monday, December 24, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss
Mon 12/24 11:33 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by APPLE INC., FACEBOOK INC., GOOGLE INC., TWITTER, INC. (Willen, Brian) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 12/13 12:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Redlined Comparison against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC..(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 12/17 10:50 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against APPLE INC., FACEBOOK INC., GOOGLE INC., TWITTER, INC. with Jury Demand filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (tth) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 12/06 12:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's26 Consent Motion to Amend/Correct1 Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants'22 Joint Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. It is also hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a redline comparison of the original complaint and the amended complaint by December 13, 2018 to comply with the Court's Standing Order2 that "[a]ny amended pleadings shall be accompanied by a redline comparison of the original and amended pleading." SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/06/18. (lctnm1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 12/06 3:56 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 12/13/2018. (hmc) |
||
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 12/05 6:36 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
.Order
Mon 12/03 11:32 AM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend its complaint that is compliant with Local Civil Rule 7(m), all other Local Rules, and the Courts Standing Order on or before Friday, December 7, 2018 or, alternatively, Plaintiff may oppose Defendants'22 Motion to Dismiss on or before Friday, December 7, 2018. Failure to respond could result in the Motion to Dismiss as being treated as conceded under Local Civil Rule 7(b). See attached Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/3/18. (lctnm1) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 12/03 12:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend its complaint or opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due by 12/7/2018. (hmc) |
||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response to Order of the Court
Fri 11/30 6:42 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC..(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 11/30 5:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER striking Plaintiff's23 Motion to Amend/Correct for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(m), which requires the moving party to discuss any anticipated non-dispositive motion in a civil action with opposing counsel and to "include in its motion a statement that the required discussion occurred, and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/30/18. (lctnm1) |
||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 11/28 9:14 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
30+
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Fri 11/16 5:44 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by TWITTER, INC. (Willen, Brian) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/29 4:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan M. Jacobson, :Firm- Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC, :Address- 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor. Phone No. - (212) 999-5800. Fax No. - (212) 999-5899 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5763541. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TWITTER, INC.(Willen, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jonathan M. Jacobson, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/29 5:17 PM
|
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 10/29 6:40 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' responsive pleading to the Complaint due by 11/16/2018. Plaintiff's opposition to any motion to dismiss due by 12/17/2018. Defendants' reply to any opposition due by 1/11/2019. (hmc) |
||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Fri 10/26 5:56 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TWITTER, INC. (Willen, Brian) |
|
19 | 19
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Fri 10/26 4:46 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FACEBOOK INC. (Allen, Kenneth) |
|
18 | 18
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Fri 10/26 4:42 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by APPLE INC. (Gottlieb, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Isaacson on behalf of APPLE INC. (Isaacson, William) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Adam Kraehenbuehl on behalf of APPLE INC. (Kraehenbuehl, James) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Willen on behalf of TWITTER, INC. (Willen, Brian) |
|
14 | 14
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Fri 10/26 3:04 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOOGLE INC. (Schmidtlein, John) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Gottlieb on behalf of APPLE INC. (Gottlieb, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to
Fri 10/26 2:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Entry of Briefing Schedule by GOOGLE INC. (Schmidtlein, John) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Goodman Hentoff on behalf of GOOGLE INC. (Hentoff, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kannon K. Shanmugam on behalf of GOOGLE INC. (Shanmugam, Kannon) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Schmidtlein on behalf of GOOGLE INC. (Schmidtlein, John) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Miller on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Miller, Mary) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Winn Allen on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Allen, Kenneth) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/26 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Craig S. Primis on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Primis, Craig) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Fri 10/26 6:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting the Defendants'12 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 16, 2018. Plaintiff shall oppose any motion to dismiss filed by Defendants on or before December 17, 2018. Defendants may reply to any opposition on or before January 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/26/18. (ltnm1) |
||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 10/03 10:57 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ALPHABET INC. (dba GOOGLE INC.) (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Mon 10/01 3:28 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC..(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 09/05 9:40 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to APPLE INC., FACEBOOK INC., GOOGLE INC., TWITTER, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) |
|
2 | 2
order
.Order
Tue 09/04 11:09 AM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/4/18. (lctnm1) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 08/31 5:29 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) |
||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/29 6:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5664678) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC..(Klayman, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |