Town of Westford, Massachusetts v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46007 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:18-cv-11379 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:32 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Stores East, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Westford, Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:14 PM EDT |
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7211252 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Town of Westford, Massachusetts.(Sandman, Richard) [Transferred from mad on 8/29/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Category Form | ||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Pacho, Arnold) [Transferred from mad on 8/29/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,, Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC, Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 8/29/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 45 in MDL Case 2408 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 8/29/2018.] | |
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 45 in MDL Case 2804 received from Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from mad on 8/29/2018.] | |
6 | 6 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 07/24/2018. Original file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. (Halley, Taylor)[Transferred from mad on 8/29/2018.] | |
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:18-cv-11379. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |