Kittitas County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46008 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Washington Eastern, 1:18-cv-03151 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:32 PM EST |
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1 through 100
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Kittitas County
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
Terminated: 10/01/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:47 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator) [Transferred from waed on 8/29/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Pharma Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Cephalon Inc, Allergan PLC fka Actavis PLC, Allergan Finance LLC, fka Actavis Inc, Allergan Finance, LLC fka Actavis Inc fka Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Actavis LLC, Activis Pharma Inc fka Watson Pharma Inc, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, John and Jane Does 1 through 100 inclusive. ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2957785) Jury Demand. Filed by Kittitas County. (AY, Case Administrator). [Transferred from waed on 8/29/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE by Kittitas County Related Case N.D. Ohio 1:17-md-02804-DAP (Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from waed on 8/29/2018.] | |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (AY, Case Administrator) [Transferred from waed on 8/29/2018.] | |
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER Transferring Case. Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Jeffery Luthi, Clerk of the MDL Panel.(RG, Chief Deputy) [Transferred from waed on 8/29/2018.] | |
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Eastern. Case number 1:18-cv-03151. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |