Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-41677

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barbara Ellis-Monro
Case #: 4:18-ap-04027
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2018
Terminated:May 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Avalon Industrial Products, LLC
PO Box 338
Dalton, GA 30722
Represented By
Avalon Industrial Products, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Karel Vercruyssen
4650 Polo Lane
Atlanta, GA 30339
Represented By
Karel Vercruyssen
contact info
Defendant
Joyce White
18017 Chatsworth St., #357
Granada Hills, CA 91344
Represented By
Joyce White
contact info
Defendant
The CAMI Trust
PO Box 1989
Dalton, GA 30722
Represented By
The CAMI Trust
contact info
Defendant
South Richmond Chemicals, LLC
PO Box 1989
Dalton, GA 30722
Represented By
South Richmond Chemicals, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Pinnacle Polymers, LLC
One Pinnacle Avenue
Garyville, LA 70051
Represented By
Pinnacle Polymers, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Marglen Industries, Inc.
1748 Ward Mountain Road
Rome, GA 30161
Represented By
Marglen Industries, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Centaur Technologies, LLC
PO Box 338
Dalton, GA 30722
Represented By
Centaur Technologies, LLC
contact info
Defendant
CEEA, LLC
208 W. Gordon St., Suite 2B
Dalton, GA 30720
Represented By
CEEA, LLC
contact info
Defendant
OneSource Sample, LLC
1812 Kimberly Park Dr.
Dalton, GA 30720
Represented By
OneSource Sample, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Leinster Global, Inc.
Represented By
Leinster Global, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Leo Van Steenberge
Represented By
Leo Van Steenberge
contact info
Defendant
Sabuka, LLC
Represented By
Sabuka, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Renuco Recycling Company, LLC
950 Riverbend Rd.
Dalton, GA 30705
Represented By
Renuco Recycling Company, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Beaulieu Canada Company, Inc.
Represented By
Beaulieu Canada Company, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Centaur Properties, LLC
PO Box 338
Dalton, GA 30722
Represented By
Centaur Properties, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Centaur Marketing Group, LLC
PO Box 338
Dalton, GA 30722
Represented By
Centaur Marketing Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Centaur Equestrian, LLC
PO Box 338
Dalton, GA 30722
Represented By
Centaur Equestrian, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Centaur Consolidated Companies, LLC
PO Box 338
Dalton, GA 30722
Represented By
Centaur Consolidated Companies, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Beaulieu International Group
Represented By
Beaulieu International Group
contact info
Defendant
Beaulieu Fibres International NV
Represented By
Beaulieu Fibres International NV
contact info
Defendant
John Bryant
202 N. Goose Hill Rd.
Rocky Face, GA 30740
Represented By
John Bryant
contact info
Defendant
Rosanne B. St. Clair
12 Bluebird Circle SE
White, GA 30184
Represented By
Rosanne B. St. Clair
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Astrachan
6376 Rosecommon Dr.
Peachtree Corners, GA 30092
Represented By
Joseph Astrachan
contact info
Defendant
Ralph Boe
25 Cliffside Crossing
Sandy Springs, GA 30350
Represented By
Ralph Boe
contact info
Defendant
Carl M. Bouckaert
PO Box 4449
Dalton, GA 30719
Represented By
Carl M. Bouckaert
contact info
Defendant
Nicolas E. Bouckaert
1851 Berry Bennett Rd., Apt R
Chatsworth, GA 30705
Represented By
Nicolas E. Bouckaert
contact info
Defendant
Stanislas A. Bouckaert
839 Lake Ave., NE
Atlanta, GA 30307
Represented By
Stanislas A. Bouckaert
contact info
Defendant
Stephanie C. Bouckaert
1699 Berry Bennett Rd.
Chatsworth, GA 30705
Represented By
Stephanie C. Bouckaert
contact info
Defendant
Constance Cantrell
7305 Radnor Rd.
Bethesda, MD 20817
Represented By
Constance Cantrell
contact info
Defendant
Annette Cyr
810 Boylston St.
Chattanooga, TN 37405
Represented By
Annette Cyr
contact info
Defendant
Vincent Donargo
4525 Oakside Pt.
Marietta, GA 30067
Represented By
Vincent Donargo
contact info
Defendant
Mieke D. Hanssens
1699 Berry Bennett Rd., Apt R
Chatsworth, GA 30705
Represented By
Mieke D. Hanssens
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Steven Hillis
744 Town Creek Dr.
Canton, GA 30115
Represented By
Ronald Steven Hillis
contact info
Defendant
G. Michael Hofmann
7 Dovercrest Court
Greensboro, NC 27407
Represented By
G. Michael Hofmann
contact info
Defendant
Del Land
1230 Gunstock Creek Rd.
Elijay, GA 30540
Represented By
Del Land
contact info
Defendant
David A. Marr
314 Signal Dr.
Rossville, GA 30741
Represented By
David A. Marr
contact info
Defendant
Ray A. Mullinax
63 Champagne Circle
Ringgold, GA 30736
Represented By
Ray A. Mullinax
contact info
Defendant
J. Michael Pollard
3611 Kings Rd.
Chattanooga, TN 37416
Represented By
J. Michael Pollard
contact info
Defendant
Nathalie B. Pollard
3611 Kings Rd.
Chattanooga, TN 37416
Represented By
Nathalie B. Pollard
contact info
Defendant
Richard W. Roedel
5 Drayton Hall
Bluffton, SC 29910
Represented By
Richard W. Roedel
contact info
Defendant
Lawrence J. Rogers
3607 Gaston Rd.
Greensboro, NC 27407
Represented By
Lawrence J. Rogers
contact info
Plaintiff
PMCM 2, LLC, Liquidating Trustee for the Estates of Beaulieu Group, LLC, et al
Represented By
John F. Isbell
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 29 2021
Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Motion to Dismiss (Related Doc # 142) Service by BNC. Entered on 9/29/2021. (mks)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
504 504 misc Returned Mail Wed 07/24 2:21 PM
Returned mail addressed to: Beaulieu International Group, Holstraat 59 8790 Waregem, BELGIUM. Related [+] (mks)
Related: [-] 497
503 503 misc Returned Mail Wed 07/24 2:17 PM
Returned mail addressed to: Leinster Global, Inc., 3905 Two Exchange Square, SUite No. 8944 8 Connaught Place Central, HONG KONG. Related [+] (mks)
Related: [-] 497