Huang v. Ohio State University et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Victoria A Roberts |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-12727 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 27, 2019 4:02 AM EST |
Defendant
Ohio State University
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
George Rizzoni
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meng Huang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 05/15 10:47 PM
Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case 2:19-cv-01976, filed 05/15/2019. (VLun) |
||
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Transferring Case Outside the State of Michigan
Tue 05/14 3:52 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Southern District of Ohio. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (DPer) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Tue 05/14 7:39 PM
Case transferred to Southern District of Ohio. (VLun) |
||
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Tue 05/07 1:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2019 re12 MOTION to Dismiss or, In ther Alternative, Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio filed by Ohio State University, George Rizzoni. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques) (LVer) |
||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/06 2:29 PM
Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing on Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Venue reset for 5/7/2019 at 12:30 PM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts in Courtroom 1080. PLEASE NOTE THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY. (LVer) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Thu 04/04 10:49 PM
ORDER Granting23 Motion for Order Dismissing Certain Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint. Counts A, I, J, K, L, and N are Dismissed.. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/27 10:13 AM
Set Hearing as to12 MOTION to Dismiss or, In ther Alternative, Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio . Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts in Courtroom 1080. (LVer) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 03/20 10:27 AM
RESPONSE to23 MOTION for Order TO ENTER STIPULATED PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN COUNTS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Ohio State University, George Rizzoni. (Corl, Christina) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
For Order
Tue 03/19 4:19 PM
MOTION for Order TO ENTER STIPULATED PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN COUNTS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Meng Huang. (Horowitz, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulated Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 02/28 9:34 PM
ORDER Granting20 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess Page Limitation. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 02/26 4:57 PM
REPLY to Response re12 MOTION to Dismiss or, In ther Alternative, Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio filed by Ohio State University, George Rizzoni. (Corl, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Unpublished Cases | ||
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Leave to File
Fri 02/22 10:00 AM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File (Unopposed) to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Page Limitation by Ohio State University, George Rizzoni. (Corl, Christina) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
52
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 01/29 6:50 PM
RESPONSE to12 MOTION to Dismiss or, In ther Alternative, Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio filed by Meng Huang. (Horowitz, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Meng Huang, | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit 2 - Tolling Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 62 pgs Exhibit 3 - Unreported Cases | ||
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 01/22 4:14 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Deadlines for Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 01/16 3:30 PM
ORDER Granting16 Motion for Leave to File Brief In Excess of Page Limits. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Leave to File
Tue 01/15 2:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitation by Meng Huang. (Fox, Bruce) |
|
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
notice
Appearance
Wed 12/05 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Horowitz on behalf of Meng Huang. (Horowitz, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 12/04 8:46 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re12 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio Response due by 1/22/2019 Reply due by 1/28/2019 . Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 11/30 11:26 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss or Transfer by Meng Huang. (Fox, Bruce) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
55
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Thu 11/15 11:31 AM
MOTION to Dismiss or, In ther Alternative, Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio by Ohio State University, George Rizzoni. (Corl, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A - Affidavit of J. Bons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B - Unpublished Cases | ||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Extend Time to - Free
Tue 11/06 12:49 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint. Response due by 11/16/2018 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin) |
|
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Thu 11/01 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce C. Fox on behalf of Meng Huang. (Fox, Bruce) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 10/19 11:55 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting Motion:9 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Page Limitation - Unopposed filed by Ohio State University, George Rizzoni. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin) |
||
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Leave to File
Thu 10/18 11:55 AM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Page Limitation - Unopposed by Ohio State University, George Rizzoni. (Corl, Christina) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Extend Time to - Free Stipulation and Order
Thu 09/13 2:06 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading.( Response due by 11/6/2018 ), Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/11 12:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. George Rizzoni served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Adam, John) |
|
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/11 12:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ohio State University served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Adam, John) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Mon 09/10 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney L. Nichols on behalf of Ohio State University, George Rizzoni. (Nichols, Courtney) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Mon 09/10 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L. Corl on behalf of All Defendants. (Corl, Christina) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 08/31 3:13 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *George Rizzoni* (DWor) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 08/31 3:12 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Ohio State University* (DWor) |
|
1 | 1
64
pgs
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Fri 08/31 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6886618 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne and Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Adam, John) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Fri 08/31 3:14 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DWor) |