New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:18-cv-13500
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 27, 2019 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA LP
Represented By
GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Represented By
GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Defendant
MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION
Represented By
GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Plaintiff
LAMAR SHULER
Represented By
JOHN MICHAEL RESTAINO, JR.
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDA NGUYEN
Represented By
JOHN MICHAEL RESTAINO, JR.
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
order Stipulation and Order Thu 03/20 10:49 AM
STIPULATION AND TEXT ORDER of DISMISSAL as to MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, ASTRAZENECA LP and ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP terminated. So Ordered by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/30/2025. (krg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 03/11 5:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION. (HINDY, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
12 12 4 pgs order Order Wed 01/31 8:26 AM
MDL STIPULATION & ORDER to Further Extend Briefing Schedule for Motions for Leave to Amend Complaints Under CMO 101. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/31/2024. (jl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/06 7:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC, GSK Consumer Health, Inc. re9 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, (MCCONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Wed 08/30 9:02 AM
STIPULATION & ORDER setting Briefing Schedule for Motions for Leave to Amend Complaints Pursuant to CMOs 101 & 102. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/30/2023. (jl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Wed 07/26 10:00 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by LINDA SHULER.(RESTAINO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Short Form Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - SHULER, Linda as Successor in Interest of the Estate of Lamar Shuler, Deceased - SECOND AMENDED SFC,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - SHULER, Linda as Successor in Interest of the Estate of Lamar Shuler, Deceased - SECOND AMENDED SFC - Redline,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - NOTARIZED AFFIDAVIT OF LINDA SHULER dated September 14, 2022,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/28 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL GALLANT on behalf of LINDA SHULER (GALLANT, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/28 4:18 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 01/29 2:06 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Substitute Linda Shuler as Successor in Interest for the Estate of Lamar Shuler, deceased. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/29/20. (gh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
6 6 motion Substitute Party Thu 04/04 12:30 PM
First MOTION to Substitute Party Lamar Shuler, Deceased by LINDA SHULER.(RESTAINO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Death Certificate,
Att: 2 Exhibit Suggestion of Death
Friday, February 15, 2019
5 5 misc Suggestion of Death Fri 02/15 2:57 PM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record by LINDA NGUYEN, LAMAR SHULER. (RESTAINO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/05 7:41 PM
Short-Form ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND with Certificate of Service by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION.(HINDY, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/10 11:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LAMAR SHULER, LINDA NGUYEN. ASTRAZENECA LP waiver sent on 9/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP waiver sent on 9/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION waiver sent on 9/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (RESTAINO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 09/05 9:10 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, )
Related: [-]
order Case Management Order Wed 09/05 9:11 AM
For all Case Management Orders[LINK:click here] (gh, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Wed 09/05 9:12 AM
Member Case Direct File on 8/31/18, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II) (gh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 31, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/31 7:51 PM
COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8995541) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LAMAR SHULER.(RESTAINO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 09/04 3:32 PM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, )
Related: [-]