California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dale A Drozd
Referred: Barbara A Mcauliffe
Case #: 1:18-cv-01176
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2018
Terminated:Feb 28, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 27, 2019 1:29 AM PST
Defendant
Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.
Represented By
Roberta Harting Kuehne
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Paul Bartholomew Quintans
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Joel M. Purles
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Alejandro David Szwarcsztejn
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Barbara J. Miller
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Golden State FC, LLC
Represented By
Roberta Harting Kuehne
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Paul Bartholomew Quintans
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Joel M. Purles
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Alejandro David Szwarcsztejn
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Barbara J. Miller
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alberto Gianini
Represented By
Shawn Charles Westrick
Westrick Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Brittany Hagman
Represented By
Shawn Charles Westrick
Westrick Law Firm
contact info

GPO Sep 13 2018
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/2018. (Valdez, E)
GPO Sep 13 2018
STIPULATED FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d) ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/2018. The Court adopts the stipulated Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) order submitted by the parties regarding the disclosure of a communication or information covered by the attorney-client privilege or work-product protection. (Valdez, E)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, February 28, 2019
45 45 4 pgs order Order Consolidating Cases ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/28 4:29 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/26/2019. Lead Case is 1:18-cv-120 DAD-BAM, Member Case is 1:18-cv-1176 DAD-BAM; MEMBER CASE CLOSED; All Future Filings to be Made in Lead Case.(Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
44 44 misc Stipulation Mon 02/25 3:59 PM
STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND FILE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND REQUEST FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC. (Miller, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
43 43 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 01/03 12:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of the case, the Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 1/8/2019 to April 3, 2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . The parties SHALL file a JOINT Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties wishing to appear telephonically for said hearing, may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866 . Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2019. NOTE: Motion to Stay (Doc.35 ) pending before Judge Drozd. (Valdez, E)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
42 42 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 11/20 11:08 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 11/20/2018.35 Motion to Stay argued, submitted and taken under submission. Written order will issue. Plaintiffs' Counsel Shawn Westrick telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Barbara Miller and Joel Purles telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Thorp, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
41 41 order Minute Order Thu 11/15 10:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/15/2018; the parties are encouraged to appear telephonically for the35 Motion to Stay on calendar 11/20/2018, and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at 9:30am. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing, if you have not already done so, you must email Courtroom Deputy Jami Thorp, at JThorp@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Thorp, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 05, 2018
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/05 12:08 PM
REPLY by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC to RESPONSE to35 MOTION to STAY. (Miller, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
39 39 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 11/01 1:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): with the Order Relating and Reassigning Case by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/5/2018 (Doc.32 ) - the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is CONTINUED from the calendar of 12/11/2018 before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto to January 8, 2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report , carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference ( see Doc. 29 ), one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. The new case number is: 1:18-cv-01176-DAD-BAM , to be used on all future filings. The parties wishing to appear telephonically for said hearing, may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866 . Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/1/2018. (Valdez, E)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
38 38 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 10/24 7:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/24/2018. Motion to Stay currently set for 11/6/2018 is CONTINUED to 11/20/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Thorp, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
37 37 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 10/23 2:32 PM
OPPOSITION by Brittany Hagman to35 MOTION to STAY. (Westrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
36 36 misc Designation of Counsel Wed 10/10 12:27 PM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Roberta Harting Kuehne terminated (Kuehne, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
35 35 motion Stay Wed 09/26 1:03 PM
MOTION to STAY by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Miller, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Defendants' Motion to STay Proceedings Pending Overlapping First-Filed Action Currently on Appeal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Joel M. Purles in support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Overlapping First-Filed Action Currently on Appeal,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - H in support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Overlapping First-Filed Action Currently on Appeal,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 13, 2018
34 34 3 pgs order Order Thu 09/13 9:47 AM
STIPULATED FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d) ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/2018. The Court adopts the stipulated Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) order submitted by the parties regarding the disclosure of a communication or information covered by the attorney-client privilege or work-product protection. (Valdez, E)
Related: [-]
33 33 14 pgs order Order Thu 09/13 9:45 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/2018. (Valdez, E)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
32 32 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 09/05 11:36 AM
ORDER Relating and Reassigning Case signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/04/2018 New Case Number: 1:18-cv-1176 DAD-BAM.(Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
31 31 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 09/04 11:16 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Order by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC. (Kuehne, Roberta)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 09/04 11:12 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC. (Kuehne, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 31, 2018
29 29 misc Civil New Case Documents for DAD Fri 08/31 9:50 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Jessen, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
28 28 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 08/31 9:41 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:18-cv-00024.
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 30, 2018
27 27 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A)26 by Judge James V. Selna transferring case to Eastern District of California. Case transferred via intra district electronic transfer. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
26 26 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of California filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC.(Kuehne, Roberta) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 20, 2018
25 25 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to MONDAY, 10/15/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (kt) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
24 24 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14 days, filed by Plaintiffs Alberto Gianini, Brittany Hagman.. (Westrick, Shawn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 02, 2018
23 23 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation MDL 2504. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the motions for transfer of the actions listed on Schedule A are denied. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2018
22 22 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, on Stipulation to Further Continue Scheduling Conference21 . Having read and considered the Parties' Stipulation to Continue the Scheduling Conference currently set for July 9, 2018 at 11:30 a.m., the Stipulation is approved. The Court hereby orders as follows: 1. The Scheduling Conference is continued to August 20, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
21 21 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 9, 2018 to August 20, 2018 filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC.(Kuehne, Roberta) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 04, 2018
20 20 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: On Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference19 . Scheduling Conference continued to 7/9/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (mt) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
19 19 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 11, 2018 to July 9, 2018 filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Does, Golden State FC LLC.(Attorney Barbara J Miller added to party Does(pty:dft))(Miller, Barbara) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
18 18 NOTICE of Lodgment of Motion to Transfer Action to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC.(Kuehne, Roberta) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Motion and Supporting Papers
17 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Roberta H Kuehne on behalf of Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC (Attorney Roberta H Kuehne added to party Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Roberta H Kuehne added to party Golden State FC LLC(pty:dft))(Kuehne, Roberta) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
16 16 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting Stipulation for Relief From Local Rule 23-315 . Having considered the parties' Stipulation for Relief From Local Rule 23-3, the Court finds, good cause appearing, that the certification deadlines will be determined at the Scheduling Conference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The deadlines related to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, will be determined at the Scheduling Conference. (dro) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
15 15 Joint STIPULATION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Alberto Gianini, Brittany Hagman.(Westrick, Shawn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 30, 2018
14 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Szwarcsztejn on behalf of Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC (Attorney David Szwarcsztejn added to party Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Szwarcsztejn added to party Golden State FC LLC(pty:dft))(Szwarcsztejn, David) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
13 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/4/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
12 12 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
11 11 NOTICE Compliance filed by Defendant Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Does, Golden State FC LLC. Defendants' Notice of Compliance (Miller, Barbara) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
10 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other)4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge James V. Selna. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:18-cv-24-JVS (SHKx). (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
7 7 Proof of Service filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (Miller, Barbara) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
6 6 DECLARATION of Zane Brown re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC. (Miller, Barbara) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
5 5 DECLARATION of Peter Nickerson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC. (Miller, Barbara) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC. (Miller, Barbara) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISCLOSURE of Statement re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 - Defendants' Disclosure Statement - filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC (Miller, Barbara) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC. (Miller, Barbara) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS 1723776 Receipt No: 0973-21053753 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Golden State FC LLC, Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.. (Attorney Barbara J Miller added to party Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Barbara J Miller added to party Golden State FC LLC(pty:dft))(Miller, Barbara) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Does, Golden State FC LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Brittany Hagman, Alberto Gianini. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/4/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A PAGE 14) (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to FIRST AMENDED Complaint, filed by Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Golden State FC LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/4/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B PAGE 61)(ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/31/2018.]
Related: [-]