County of San Bernardino et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46032 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 5:18-cv-01527 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:34 PM EST |
Defendant
Raymond Sackler Trust
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D. A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken Inc
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of San Bernardino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/15/2019 2:51 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 365 pgs COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22114581 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs The People of the State of California, County of San Bernardino. (Attorney Crystal Gayle Foley added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:pla), Attorney Crystal Gayle Foley added to party The People of the State of California (pty:pla))(Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs County of San Bernardino, The People of the State of California. (Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Hanly, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Charles J. Crueger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Erin K. Dickinson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Krista K. Baisch. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
10 | 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Hanly, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs County of San Bernardino, The People of The State of California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22120570) filed by Plaintiffs County of San Bernardino, The People of The State of California. (Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting11 Non-Resident Attorney Hanly, Jr., Paul J. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of County of San Bernardino, et al., designating Foley, Crystal as local counsel. (yl) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 5:18-cv-01372 CBM(ASx) (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18)4 . The case number is incorrectly shown as 5:18-cv-01577 DSF (SPx). The case number should read 5:18-cv-01527 DSF (SPx). (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 Conditional Transfer Order - CT0-50 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2804, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Ohio and assigned to Honorable Dan A. Polster. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp) [Transferred from cacd on 9/4/2018.] | |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central. Case number 5:18-cv-01527. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |