Burtch v. Brody
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12076
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12076
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50718 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gregory D. Brody
255 Hudson Street Apartment 3C
New York, NY 10013 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeoffrey L. Burtch, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 549
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 08/01 1:16 PM
Receipt Number 10094542 , Fee Amount $350.00 (GM) |
||
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Thu 01/10 11:10 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 01/10 3:31 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50718 Closed (DMC) |
||
Monday, November 12, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Agenda of Matters Schedules for Hearing (HEARING RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Mon 11/12 1:56 PM
HEARING RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Hearing Originally Scheduled for 11/15/2018 has been rescheduled. Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 09/06 11:11 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50718 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Thu 09/06 10:06 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Gregory D. Brody. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/5/2018. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 09/06 9:57 AM
Adversary case 18-50718 Complaint to Avoid Transfers and to Recover Property Transferred by Jeoffrey L. Burtch against Gregory D. Brody. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/5/2018. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |