Burtch v. Jacobson Warehouse Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12076
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12076
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50719 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Jacobson Warehouse Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeoffrey L. Burtch, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 549
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 08/01 1:18 PM
Receipt Number 10094543, Fee Amount $350.00 (GM) |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 08/13 11:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50719 Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Fri 08/09 11:33 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. Hearing scheduled for 8/13/2019 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
22 | 22
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Fri 08/09 11:24 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE FOR AN ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 9019 Order Signed on 8/9/2019. (DRG) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 08/09 9:07 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. Hearing scheduled for 8/13/2019 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Wed 08/07 5:34 PM
Certificate of No Objection regarding Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Approving Settlement [Docket No. 669; Adv. Pro. Docket No. 17] Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Withdrawal of Document - Notice
Wed 08/07 5:28 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Certificate of No Objection Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
Wed 08/07 4:14 PM
**WITHDRAWN** - 8/7/2019. SEE DOCKET # 19. Certificate of No Objection regarding Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Approving Settlement Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. (Fischer, Gregory) Modified on 8/8/2019 (DMC) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Thu 07/18 4:32 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. Hearing scheduled for 8/13/2019 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/6/2019. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 06/14 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 06/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate)
Tue 06/11 10:48 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Charles Brown, III, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 8/12/2019. Signed on 6/11/2019. (DMC) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/11 11:27 AM
Status Report in Adversary Proceedings Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Fri 03/15 11:36 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery (Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and First Set of Requests for Admission Directed to Defendant) Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Service - Notice
Fri 02/01 4:29 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant, Jacobson Warehouse Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures Filed by Jacobson Warehouse Company, Inc. (Mersky, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Service - Notice
Thu 01/31 10:09 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Fri 01/11 4:20 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/10 3:46 PM
Scheduling Order. The case judge is Christopher S. Sontchi. Signed on 1/10/2019. (DMC) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Thu 01/10 11:47 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 01/10 11:08 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, November 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Schedules for Hearing (HEARING RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Mon 11/12 1:56 PM
HEARING RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Hearing Originally Scheduled for 11/15/2018 has been rescheduled. Filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch. Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/11 12:41 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Jacobson Warehouse Company, Inc. Mediation due date: 02/8/2019.(Mersky, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Alias Summons
Thu 09/13 10:23 AM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Jacobson Warehouse Company, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/13/2018. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 09/06 11:11 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50719 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Thu 09/06 10:15 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Jacobson Warehouse Company, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/5/2018. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 09/06 10:11 AM
Adversary case 18-50719 Complaint to Avoid Transfers and to Recover Property Transferred by Jeoffrey L. Burtch against Jacobson Warehouse Company, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/5/2018. (Fischer, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |