California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:18-cv-05472
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2018
Terminated:Jun 14, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 05, 2019 12:47 AM PST
Defendant
AFSCME Local 2700
Shawn Stewart, President 1333 Pine Street, # I
Martinez, CA 94553
Represented By
Jacob Raffel Karabell
Bredhoff And Kaiser, PLLC
contact info
Andrew H. Baker
Beeson Tayer & Bodine, Apc
contact info
April Heather Pullium
Bredhoff And Kaiser, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kate Bieker
Martinez, CA 94553
Represented By
Steve Cikes
Sloan Sakai Yeung & Wong LLP
contact info
Justin Otto Sceva
Sloan Sakai Yeung And Wong LLP
contact info
Ivan O'Neill Delventhal
Sloan Sakai Yeung & Wong LLP
contact info
Intervenor
Attorney General Xavier Becerra
California Attorney General 1300 I Street Suite 125
Sacramento, CA 95814
Represented By
Anthony Paul O'Brien
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark R. Smith
8001 Braddock RD Ste 600
Springfield, VA 22160
Represented By
W. James Young
C/o National Right To Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Superior Court, County of Contra Costa
Terminated: 11/26/2018
725 Court Street
Martinez, CA 94553
Represented By
Steve Cikes
Sloan Sakai Yeung & Wong LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 04 2018
ORDER denying Motion for TRO 15. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 4, 2018. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018).
GPO Nov 16 2018
ORDER Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction 22. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on November 16, 2018. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
GPO Jun 13 2019
ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Denying 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Vince Chhabria on June 13, 2019. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 06, 2021
83 83 1 pgs appeal ORDER of United States Supreme Court Tue 12/07 1:16 PM
ORDER of United States Supreme Court. The Court today entered the following order in the above-entitled case: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]