Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Richard W Story
Referred: J Clay Fuller
Case #: 2:18-cv-00156
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2018
Terminated:Dec 07, 2018

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 07, 2018
10 10 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 12/07 3:53 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing for failure to keep court informed of current address. (rsg)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/7/2018) Clerk's Judgment
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Fri 12/07 3:42 PM
ORDER approving and adopting the7 Final Report and Recommendation. As such, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice because Plaintiff has failed to obey a lawful order of this Court and has failed to keep the Court informed of his current address. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/07/2018. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 12/07 3:44 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/07 3:55 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Jonathan Nichols re10 Clerk's Judgment,9 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 12/06 5:47 PM
Submission of7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re4 Amended Complaint, filed by Michael Jonathan Nichols, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
8 8 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Wed 11/14 4:44 PM
ORDER for Service of7 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/14/2018. (rsg)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Wed 11/14 4:42 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re4 Amended Complaint, that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice because Plaintiff has failed to obey a lawful order of this Court and has failed to keep the Court informed of his current address. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the reference to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/14/2018. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/14 4:45 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Jonathan Nichols re8 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/23 8:47 AM
Submission of5 Order,6 Mail Returned, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2018
6 6 misc Mail Returned Mon 10/22 5:10 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Jonathan Nichols re5 Order. Marked: RTS no longer at address. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
5 5 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 10/10 4:34 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to file a second amended complaint within 28 days to correct the deficiencies noted above. He may also choose to file two separate complaints raising two separate causes of action denial of access to the courts and medical deliberate indifference. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff two civil rights complaint forms, along with a copy of this order, and to resubmit this matter to the undersigned upon receipt of Plaintiffs response or when the 28-day period expires. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/10/2018. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/10 4:36 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Jonathan Nichols re5 Order and copies of civil rights complaint forms. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/25 4:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michael Jonathan Nichols.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Grievances
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/25 4:55 PM
Submission of4 Amended Complaint, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
3 3 4 pgs order Order ruling on IFP ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 09/10 4:27 PM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. The Warden of Plaintiffs place of incarceration or the Wardens designee SHALL COLLECT the monthly payments from Plaintiffs inmate account AND REMIT them to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, as verified by separate notice from the Clerk to the Warden. The Clerk SHALL TRANSMIT copy of this Order to the Warden. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to submit an amended complaint within 28 days to correct the above deficiencies. Plaintiff is ADVISED that the amended complaint WILL REPLACE the original complaint in its entirety. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward to Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 civil complaint form, together with a copy of this Order, and to resubmit this matter to the Magistrate Judge upon receipt of the amended complaint or at the expiration of the 28-day period noted above. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 09/10/2018. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/10 4:30 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Jonathan Nichols and the Warden re3 Order ruling on IFP. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/06 9:47 AM
Submission of2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account and1 Complaint to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller for IFP and Frivolity Review. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
2 2 misc Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account Thu 09/06 9:46 AM
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Michael Jonathan Nichols. (dgr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/06 9:45 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Michael Jonathan Nichols.(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet