New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Case #: 1:18-cv-08068
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2018
Terminated:Sep 06, 2018

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, September 07, 2018
misc Mail Order by Certified Mail Fri 09/07 11:41 AM
Mailed a copy of4 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint),3 Order of Dismissal, to Kevin M. McGlynn 8951701646 Rikers Island-A.M.K.C. 18-18 Hazen St. East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (aea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
4 4 order Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint) Fri 09/07 8:53 AM
CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice to the pending action under docket number 18-CV-7280. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/6/2018) (rjm)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 09/07 8:46 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1) for the limited purpose of dismissing this complaint without prejudice. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice as duplicative. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/6/2018) (rjm)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Fri 09/07 8:49 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
5 5 motion Court to Request Counsel Fri 09/07 9:22 AM
APPLICATION FOR THE COURT TO REQUEST PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by Kevin M. McGlynn.(sc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Prisoner Authorization Thu 09/06 1:28 PM
PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Kevin M. McGlynn.(rdz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/06 1:26 PM
COMPLAINT against 18B Panel, Nicole Adamson, All Prosecuters involved in all of the cases, All threatened Team at Mid-Hudson, All threatened team at SBPC, Ralph Ayala, Joseph Barbara, Shreyas Bayer, Nicole Bromberg, Gregory Carro, Abrakar Clott, Jason Cohen, Jason Cohen(MHLS Mid-Hudson), Vincent Comingano, martha Crowner, James Dennis, Dr. Chuckwboacha, Dr., Dr. K, Robyn Rihanna Fenty, Gresford Garvey, Susan Gray, Shahla Gregory, Thomas P. Griesa, Jonatha, Judge, MHLS Attorney Assigned at Bellvue Hospital, Mardacci, Orlando Marrazzo, Brian Mcleoud, Richard Melink, Dawn Mulder, Robert A. Onofry, Paranal, Raymond Raad, Officer Shan-Taya, Silver, Anne Marie Sullivan, Ramon Velez, Robert L. Weintsien. Document filed by Kevin M. McGlynn.(rdz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 09/06 1:26 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]