Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joel H Slomsky
Case #: 2:18-cv-03794
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2018
Terminated:Nov 02, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 05, 2019 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
GOOD FAMILY SUPPORT SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff
GINA MARCOLONGO
Represented By
TIMOTHY S. SEILER
Karpf Karpf & Cerutti
contact info
ANDREW OLCESE
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
ARI RISSON KARPF
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
Unrepresented Party
GOOD FAMILY SUPPORT SERVICES, INC.
609 EAST CHELTEN AVENUE
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19144


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 02, 2018
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 11/02 1:14 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 11/1/18. 11/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
5 5 misc Status Report Thu 11/01 8:21 AM
STATUS REPORT that an Order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 41.1(b) can be issued by GINA MARCOLONGO. (OLCESE, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/12 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY S. SEILER on behalf of GINA MARCOLONGO (SEILER, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/01 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW OLCESE on behalf of GINA MARCOLONGO (OLCESE, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/25 1:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GINA MARCOLONGO. GOOD FAMILY SUPPORT SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 09/06 9:23 AM
COMPLAINT against GOOD FAMILY SUPPORT SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13027460.), filed by GINA MARCOLONGO.(KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 09/06 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to GOOD FAMILY SUPPORT SERVICES, INC.. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/6/2018 (ahf)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 09/06 3:06 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GINA MARCOLONGO. (ahf)
Related: [-]